19812 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST01558 | THE ESTATE OF ANTHONY COLLINS | 7/24/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00391 | THE ESTATE OF MARIAN DOMINICK | 7/24/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01379 | THE ESTATE OF LATASHA SIMS | 7/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01528 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM HAMMER | 7/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01534 | THE ESTATE OF TERESA BROOKS | 7/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00987 | THE ESTATE OF CEZELL CHANCELLOR | 7/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2022EST01586 | THE ESTATE OF CARL BEYER | 7/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01523 | THE ESTATE OF ANTHONY WEAVER JR. | 7/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01514 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN JOHNSON JR. | 7/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01510 | THE ESTATE OF ZELMA PINKNEY | 7/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01525 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT LEWIS JR | 7/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00613 | THE ESTATE OF ALEXIS JORDAN | 7/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00272 | THE ESTATE OF REX JOHNSON | 7/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00250 | THE ESTATE OF HARVEY JOHNSON | 7/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00900 | THE ESTATE OF BILLY LANGFORD | 7/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01521 | THE ESTATE OF BETTINA BUSCEMI | 7/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01449 | THE ESTATE OF MARCELLA WILLIAMS | 7/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01515 | THE ESTATE OF PAMELA HARSHMAN | 7/19/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2022EST00763 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES FRANTZ | 7/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 58, 59, 60 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |