19812 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST01594 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD STOCK | 7/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01552 | THE ESTATE OF DAPHNE FIGGERS-TURNER | 7/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01548 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES CLAYTON | 7/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00451 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN LISKANY | 7/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01421 | THE ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER MILLS | 7/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01533 | THE ESTATE OF TANYA COBBINS | 7/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01575 | THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA GOODWIN | 7/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01590 | THE ESTATE OF JOHNNIE GRAHAM | 7/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2022EST00290 | THE ESTATE OF THERESA WALTERS | 7/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01584 | THE ESTATE OF BESSIE RHODES | 7/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01364 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM RAYMOND DRAKE | 7/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01574 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL BAZILE | 7/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01554 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT GRANDFIELD | 7/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00789 | THE ESTATE OF DARLENE DUNSON | 7/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01299 | THE ESTATE OF EMMA WILLIAMS | 7/26/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01524 | THE ESTATE OF SUZANNE REILING | 7/26/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00391 | THE ESTATE OF MARIAN DOMINICK | 7/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01442 | THE ESTATE OF KAREN RHOTON | 7/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01562 | THE ESTATE OF GREGORY SCHMIDT | 7/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 57, 58, 59 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |