19812 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST01652 | THE ESTATE OF LARRY BELLER | 8/8/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01186 | THE ESTATE OF MARIE HEATH | 8/8/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01381 | THE ESTATE OF ELIZABETH CASWELL | 8/8/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01634 | THE ESTATE OF DENNIS HOWE SR | 8/7/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01570 | THE ESTATE OF LARRY COX | 8/7/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01517 | THE ESTATE OF PAMELA KINSEY | 8/7/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01639 | THE ESTATE OF TERRY SNODGRASS | 8/4/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01549 | THE ESTATE OF KATHLEEN MCKINNEY | 8/4/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01610 | THE ESTATE OF GARY HINTON | 8/4/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01618 | THE ESTATE OF GARY PHILLIPS | 8/4/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00553 | THE ESTATE OF JOSIE DUREN-OGLETREE | 8/4/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01606 | THE ESTATE OF CARL CENTERS | 8/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01541 | THE ESTATE OF MARGARET WEBSTER | 8/1/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01556 | THE ESTATE OF BRIDGET WHITE | 7/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01595 | THE ESTATE OF GREGORY HOLM | 7/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01602 | THE ESTATE OF MARKLEY CRUM | 7/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01198 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES BOYD JR | 7/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01358 | THE ESTATE OF AMANDA HART | 7/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01599 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES BEGLEY | 7/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 56, 57, 58 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |