19812 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST01733 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLENE STOECKICHT | 8/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01191 | THE ESTATE OF MARVIN GAMBLE | 8/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01713 | THE ESTATE OF DEMETRIUS JOHNS | 8/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01170 | THE ESTATE OF ELEANOR FARIELLO | 8/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01727 | THE ESTATE OF ELIZABETH KRAUS | 8/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01684 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM MULLINS | 8/17/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01682 | THE ESTATE OF OLIVETTE TURNER | 8/17/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01287 | THE ESTATE OF GRETCHEN VINES | 8/17/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01560 | THE ESTATE OF BRENDA BARLAGE | 8/16/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01692 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN MEIER | 8/16/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01443 | THE ESTATE OF ESTHER BROWN | 8/16/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01680 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES HOGBERG | 8/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01678 | THE ESTATE OF STEPHANIE MURPHY | 8/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01369 | THE ESTATE OF MARY BRYANT | 8/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01670 | THE ESTATE OF JERRY GRISSOM | 8/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00927 | THE ESTATE OF JEAN YOUNG | 8/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01637 | THE ESTATE OF NEIL WOLLPERT | 8/11/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2022EST02572 | THE ESTATE OF JOEL BURTON | 8/11/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01662 | THE ESTATE OF DONNA MCFARLAND | 8/11/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 54, 55, 56 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |