19812 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST01775 | THE ESTATE OF DONNA POLLARD | 8/30/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01724 | THE ESTATE OF RAYCHELL COLLIER | 8/30/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01506 | THE ESTATE OF JOE JAMES | 8/29/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01768 | THE ESTATE OF SANDRA GAINES | 8/29/2023 | |||||||
EST: WILL FILED W/O PROBATE | |||||||||
2023EST01224 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL BRYANT | 8/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01657 | THE ESTATE OF HARRIET WALTON | 8/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01771 | THE ESTATE OF ROY MILLER | 8/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01297 | THE ESTATE OF STEPHANIE MESSER | 8/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01700 | THE ESTATE OF CLIFFORD KINCAID | 8/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01779 | THE ESTATE OF DEANNA EWERS | 8/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01686 | THE ESTATE OF CRYSTAL PHILLIPS | 8/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01729 | THE ESTATE OF LEATHA RAMSEY | 8/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01759 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES HURD | 8/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01783 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD NELSON | 8/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01633 | THE ESTATE OF CARL SANDERS | 8/23/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01632 | THE ESTATE OF ROOSEVELT SWIFT JR. | 8/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00346 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE SHAW | 8/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01725 | THE ESTATE OF FRANK BACHNICKI | 8/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01717 | THE ESTATE OF MARILYN HEGINBOTHAM | 8/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 53, 54, 55 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |