19812 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST01936 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS LAMBDIN | 9/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01921 | THE ESTATE OF MATTHEW ENDICOTT | 9/13/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01704 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL NEWSOME | 9/13/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01891 | THE ESTATE OF HENRY MOORE JR. | 9/12/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01406 | THE ESTATE OF GARY NUMBERS | 9/11/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01455 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES ADAMS | 9/11/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01769 | THE ESTATE OF LISA CLEVENGER | 9/5/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01753 | THE ESTATE OF CELIA FIELD | 9/5/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01815 | THE ESTATE OF GLORIA THOMAS | 9/5/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01827 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES DAVIS | 9/5/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01819 | THE ESTATE OF ROSA HICKS | 9/1/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00490 | THE ESTATE OF HARRY THATCHER | 9/1/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01790 | THE ESTATE OF JOANN MAWASHA | 9/1/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01843 | THE ESTATE OF JANET KLOTZBACK | 9/1/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01785 | THE ESTATE OF JOANN DAVIS | 8/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01821 | THE ESTATE OF HERBERT HENRY | 8/31/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01807 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL GEORGE, II | 8/30/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01699 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE YOUNG | 8/30/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 52, 53, 54 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |