19812 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST00083 | THE ESTATE OF KATRYN OWENS | 9/26/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01839 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES KIMMERLY SR | 9/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00820 | THE ESTATE OF ANN TAYLOR | 9/22/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01806 | THE ESTATE OF GLADYS SHEPHARD | 9/22/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01957 | THE ESTATE OF ELFRIEDE MARTIN | 9/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01977 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT GOODWIN | 9/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION | |||||||||
2023EST01981 | THE ESTATE OF TAE HEE KIM | 9/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01989 | THE ESTATE OF PATTY HEIDENREICH | 9/21/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01241 | THE ESTATE OF JOY VANLANDINGHAM | 9/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01866 | THE ESTATE OF JEAN YOUNG | 9/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01904 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL ELKINS | 9/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00844 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIE QUINN | 9/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01912 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD KEY | 9/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01930 | THE ESTATE OF JUDITH JONES | 9/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01873 | THE ESTATE OF HAROLD KNOPP | 9/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01867 | THE ESTATE OF MARIAN ALTER | 9/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01668 | THE ESTATE OF MARTHA KLINE | 9/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01881 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES HOPPER | 9/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01721 | THE ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER SYMES | 9/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 51, 52, 53 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |