19809 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST01018 | THE ESTATE OF JUANITA BERRY | 10/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01818 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN HUBER SR. | 10/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02053 | THE ESTATE OF ROBYN HOWARD | 10/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01860 | THE ESTATE OF MELVIN WILLIAMS | 10/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02035 | THE ESTATE OF KATHERINE SMITH | 10/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02044 | THE ESTATE OF DEBRA COCHLAN | 10/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01838 | THE ESTATE OF ELENORA DICKERSON | 10/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01863 | THE ESTATE OF DEBRA COOK | 10/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02024 | THE ESTATE OF ALDA WOODIE | 10/3/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02051 | THE ESTATE OF JAY CARTER | 9/29/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01685 | THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH STEVENS | 9/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01841 | THE ESTATE OF ALICE TOLLE | 9/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01788 | THE ESTATE OF DAVAILL GREGORY | 9/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01291 | THE ESTATE OF PHYLLIS BROWN | 9/28/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01917 | THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH LEAHEY | 9/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01884 | THE ESTATE OF PHILIP BURCH | 9/27/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02014 | THE ESTATE OF MARLENE PEGEL | 9/26/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00083 | THE ESTATE OF KATRYN OWENS | 9/26/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01839 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES KIMMERLY SR | 9/25/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 50, 51, 52 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |