19041 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00817Â E | MATTHEW FLOWERS | 10/1/2015 | |||||||
COLONIAL VILLAGE APARTMENTS vs MATTHEW FLOWERS | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00823Â E | ROBERT TAYLOR AND DAMLAN MONDAY | 10/1/2015 | |||||||
GOLD KEY REALTY vs ROBERT TAYLOR and DAMLAN MONDAY | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00801Â E | KIMBERLY GERLACH | 10/1/2015 | |||||||
REALMARK CORP c/o Wayne Estates vs KIMBERLY GERLACH | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00806Â E | CAROLYN WOODS | 10/1/2015 | |||||||
REALMARK CORP vs CAROLYN WOODS | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00809Â E | CHRISTOPHER D. GONZALEZ AND ASHEY EVANS | 10/1/2015 | |||||||
REALMARK CORP vs CHRISTOPHER D. GONZALEZ and ASHEY EVANS | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00816Â E | AMY LOCKARD | 10/1/2015 | |||||||
ANTHONY METZNER and DEBRA METZNER vs AMY LOCKARD | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00811Â E | TINA MICHELLE STILL | 10/1/2015 | |||||||
REALMARK CORP vs TINA MICHELLE STILL | |||||||||
2015Â CVIÂ 00740Â E | MELISSA WENTWORTH | 9/30/2015 | |||||||
MICHAEL E DUNCAN vs MELISSA WENTWORTH | |||||||||
2015Â CVIÂ 00734Â E | JERRY COMBS | 9/30/2015 | |||||||
KELLY SIMS vs JERRY COMBS | |||||||||
2014Â CVFÂ 00977Â E | KARLA E COBB | 9/29/2015 | |||||||
EXIT REALTY PARTNERS, LLC vs KARLA E COBB | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00473Â W | CARLISA HARRIS, ET AL | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA FOX RUN APARTMENTS vs CARLISA HARRIS, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVIÂ 00509Â E | WAYNE ESTATES | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
LISA BUCHHALTER and MIKE BREWER vs WAYNE ESTATES | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00862Â W | PRECIOUS CARMICHAEL, ET AL | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES AGENT FOR 4900 BLOOMFIELD, LLC vs PRECIOUS CARMICHAEL, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00861Â W | ISIS MORRELL, ET AL | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES AGENT FOR 4900 BLOOMFIELD, LLC vs ISIS MORRELL, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00848Â W | EUGENE MCINTOSH, ET AL | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
EVELYN BARNES vs EUGENE MCINTOSH, ET AL | |||||||||
2011Â CVFÂ 00688Â W | STEPHEN B FORTSON | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC vs STEPHEN B FORTSON | |||||||||
2007Â CVFÂ 00455Â W | CIERA F AMES | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
CREDIT INVESTMENTS, INC. ASSIGNEE OF PREMIER ATHLE vs CIERA F AMES | |||||||||
2015Â CVIÂ 00798Â W | DARYL'S TROTWOOD TOWING | 9/25/2015 | |||||||
PAUL L WILCOX vs DARYL'S TROTWOOD TOWING | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00760Â E | KRISTI PRITCHARD | 9/24/2015 | |||||||
GLENBURN GREEN CO-OPERATIVE vs KRISTI PRITCHARD | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 851, 852, 853 ... 951, 952, 953 Next |