19041 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2016Â CVIÂ 00034Â E | MAX SHURUBKO | 3/16/2016 | |||||||
BALY HAIDARA vs MAX SHURUBKO | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00220Â E | SARA BACK | 3/16/2016 | |||||||
OVERLOOK MUTUAL HOMES, INC. vs SARA BACK | |||||||||
2016Â CVHÂ 00153Â W | CAROLYN Y WILLIAMS, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHI | 3/15/2016 | |||||||
NICHOLAS A SIMPSON vs CAROLYN Y WILLIAMS, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHI | |||||||||
2015Â CVFÂ 01123Â W | CINDY DOUGHERTY | 3/14/2016 | |||||||
NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST vs CINDY DOUGHERTY | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00169Â W | FRANK BRITTON, ET AL | 3/14/2016 | |||||||
PEPZEE DENLINGER LLC BY: PEPZEE RLTY OF DYT OH LLC vs FRANK BRITTON, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00170Â W | JACKIE SCHOOLER. ET AL | 3/14/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA 4900 BLOOMFIELD, LLC vs JACKIE SCHOOLER. ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00171Â W | TOSHA ADAMS AND YOLANDA LESLIE | 3/14/2016 | |||||||
ONE4U INVESTMENTS, LLC vs TOSHA ADAMS and YOLANDA LESLIE | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00192Â E | IVAN PRETLOW AND CHRISTAL KEYES-PRETLOW | 3/10/2016 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs IVAN PRETLOW and CHRISTAL KEYES-PRETLOW | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00201Â E | JARROD A SHIVERS | 3/10/2016 | |||||||
LISA D HUBBARD vs JARROD A SHIVERS | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00198Â E | KIMBERLY CASE-NEAL | 3/10/2016 | |||||||
MIKE MCMAHAN and DON A MCMAHAN vs KIMBERLY CASE-NEAL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00195Â E | MALVIN JONES | 3/10/2016 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs MALVIN JONES | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00194Â E | ANTHONY LALA | 3/10/2016 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs ANTHONY LALA | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00191Â E | EDWARD ROBBINS AND IDA BAILEY AND | 3/10/2016 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs EDWARD ROBBINS and IDA BAILEY and | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00190Â E | BRY-ONA NAPIER | 3/10/2016 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs BRY-ONA NAPIER | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00163Â E | IRAIDA GONZALEZ | 3/10/2016 | |||||||
RIVERSIDE COMMONS LP vs IRAIDA GONZALEZ | |||||||||
2015Â CVFÂ 00429Â E | JAMIE SHARRITT AND DAWN LEDFORD | 3/9/2016 | |||||||
ROBERT HUFFMAN and SHARON HUFFMAN vs JAMIE SHARRITT and DAWN LEDFORD | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00199Â E | J.T. BYRD | 3/9/2016 | |||||||
MIKE MCMAHAN and DON A MCMAHAN vs J.T. BYRD | |||||||||
2015Â CVFÂ 00238Â E | CONSOLIDATED FURNITURE ENTERPRISES INC | 3/9/2016 | |||||||
D.M. REID ASSOCIATES, LTD C/O RACHEL J. MASON, ATT vs CONSOLIDATED FURNITURE ENTERPRI... | |||||||||
2016Â CVIÂ 00137Â E | JACK S BALL AND VERONICA BALL | 3/9/2016 | |||||||
PAMELA C LAMBALOT and ROGER L LAMBALOT vs JACK S BALL and VERONICA BALL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 811, 812, 813 ... 951, 952, 953 Next |