19041 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2016Â CVIÂ 00189Â E | 3/30/2016 | ||||||||
DUPLICATE CASE FILED IN ERROR vs | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00189Â W | MICHELLE BAWANSONI, ET AL | 3/28/2016 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS 1 II, LLC DBA WILLOWWO vs MICHELLE BAWANSONI, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00199Â W | NECOKOLA DEWBERRY, ET AL | 3/28/2016 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs NECOKOLA DEWBERRY, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00200Â W | JARON ANDREWS, ET AL | 3/28/2016 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs JARON ANDREWS, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00201Â W | AUSTIN JOHNSON, ET AL | 3/28/2016 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs AUSTIN JOHNSON, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00202Â W | SAMANTHA COTTON, ET AL | 3/28/2016 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs SAMANTHA COTTON, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00203Â W | TOKUNBO OGUNLADE, ET AL | 3/28/2016 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs TOKUNBO OGUNLADE, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00210Â W | EDWARD D BECK | 3/28/2016 | |||||||
CIRO RIVERA vs EDWARD D BECK | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00884Â W | RAYLEESHA MOSLEY, ET AL | 3/25/2016 | |||||||
SHILOH SPRINGS, LP DBA WINGATE AT BELLE MEADOWS vs RAYLEESHA MOSLEY, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVIÂ 00154Â W | REICHARD BUICK CO | 3/25/2016 | |||||||
HARRY HARDWICK vs REICHARD BUICK CO | |||||||||
2015Â CVFÂ 00532Â W | JAMES BURKE | 3/24/2016 | |||||||
FOUNTAIN SKIN CARE vs JAMES BURKE | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00254Â E | SHARON L TURNER | 3/24/2016 | |||||||
JAMES EWING and TINA EWING vs SHARON L TURNER | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00243Â E | APRIL FREDERICKS | 3/24/2016 | |||||||
DAVID DOUGHERTY and MELISSA DOUGHERTY vs APRIL FREDERICKS | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00193Â W | JOHN DILLARD, ET AL | 3/23/2016 | |||||||
ARECO REALTY vs JOHN DILLARD, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVFÂ 00896Â E | RAYMOND COMBS | 3/23/2016 | |||||||
FRANK PICCIRILLE and DENISE PICCIRILLE vs RAYMOND COMBS | |||||||||
2016Â CVHÂ 00153Â W | CAROLYN Y WILLIAMS, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHI | 3/22/2016 | |||||||
NICHOLAS A SIMPSON vs CAROLYN Y WILLIAMS, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHI | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00173Â W | KYLE YARBOROUGH | 3/21/2016 | |||||||
HARRY THATCHER vs KYLE YARBOROUGH | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00184Â W | LIZZIE JONES, ET AL | 3/21/2016 | |||||||
WALLICK PROPERTIES AGENT FOR COVENANT MANOR, INC vs LIZZIE JONES, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 01075Â W | JANICE CHINN, ET AL | 3/18/2016 | |||||||
DAYTON SENIOR CARE LLC vs JANICE CHINN, ET AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 809, 810, 811 ... 951, 952, 953 Next |