19033 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00256Â W | TRACI ADAMS, ET AL | 4/18/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES AGENT FOR 4900 BLOOMFIELD, LLC vs TRACI ADAMS, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00258Â W | CYNTHIA L RYAN | 4/18/2016 | |||||||
JOSEPH A. BINKLEY ALL WAYS PROPERTY vs CYNTHIA L RYAN | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00255Â W | KEVIN PAYNE, ET AL | 4/18/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES AGENT FOR 4900 BLOOMFIELD, LLC vs KEVIN PAYNE, ET AL | |||||||||
2013Â CVRÂ 00931Â W | DEER CREEK APARTMENTS | 4/15/2016 | |||||||
YULANDA FIELDS vs DEER CREEK APARTMENTS | |||||||||
2015Â CVRÂ 01026Â W | WINGATE AT BELLE MEADOWS APTS | 4/14/2016 | |||||||
KATHY A CURRY vs WINGATE AT BELLE MEADOWS APTS | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00327Â E | CARMEN LEWIS | 4/14/2016 | |||||||
IMPERIAL HEIGHTS PARTNERS, LP vs CARMEN LEWIS | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00328Â E | DAQUINNTAI LOCKETT | 4/14/2016 | |||||||
RIVERSIDE COMMONS LP vs DAQUINNTAI LOCKETT | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00324Â E | KEONTRE FLORENCE AND VICTORIA FERGUSON | 4/13/2016 | |||||||
DANIEL BRAD vs KEONTRE FLORENCE and VICTORIA FERGUSON | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00323Â E | KARA FARMER | 4/13/2016 | |||||||
TSM PROPERTIES LTD. vs KARA FARMER | |||||||||
2014Â CVFÂ 00959Â E | MICHAEL THALER | 4/13/2016 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO INC vs MICHAEL THALER | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00231Â W | AYIESHA CANADA, ET AL | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
HANK RICHARDSON vs AYIESHA CANADA, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00245Â W | ERIC BIDDINGS, ET AL | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
PATHFINDERS REALTY, INC. vs ERIC BIDDINGS, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00248Â W | ALEXIS MOORE, ET AL | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES FLDSTN LTD PTNRSHP DBA FOX RUN vs ALEXIS MOORE, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00249Â W | CYNTHIA MOORE, ET AL | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES FLDSTN LTD PTNRSHP DBA FOX RUN vs CYNTHIA MOORE, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00250Â W | MYRA COOPER, ET AL | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
ARECO REALTY vs MYRA COOPER, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVEÂ 00705Â W | JOHN C MOHLER AND ELLEN M SWIGER AND ALLEN SWIGER | 4/8/2016 | |||||||
WILLIE CHATTMAN vs JOHN C MOHLER and ELLEN M SWIGER and ALLEN SWIGER | |||||||||
2015Â CVGÂ 00959Â W | JAMIE MILLER AND KIMBERLY LINDER, ET AL | 4/8/2016 | |||||||
JOHN J PEARSON and TRACY R PEARSON vs JAMIE MILLER and KIMBERLY LINDER, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVIÂ 00154Â W | REICHARD BUICK CO | 4/8/2016 | |||||||
HARRY HARDWICK vs REICHARD BUICK CO | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 805, 806, 807 ... 950, 951, 952 Next |