19033 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00274Â W | GEORGE DUGAN, ET AL | 4/25/2016 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS 1 II, LLC DBA WILLOWWO vs GEORGE DUGAN, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00258Â W | CYNTHIA L RYAN | 4/25/2016 | |||||||
JOSEPH A. BINKLEY ALL WAYS PROPERTY vs CYNTHIA L RYAN | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00271Â W | DESTINEE CRABTREE | 4/25/2016 | |||||||
KEVIN EIKENBERRY vs DESTINEE CRABTREE | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00272Â W | DORA BROWN, ET AL | 4/25/2016 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE PROPERTY SOLUTIONS 1 II, LLC DBA WILLOWWO vs DORA BROWN, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00273Â W | ROBIN GESS, ET AL | 4/25/2016 | |||||||
JENRESA PROPERTIES, LLC vs ROBIN GESS, ET AL | |||||||||
2015Â CVFÂ 01071Â W | LARRY L TODD AND MICHAEL TODD | 4/22/2016 | |||||||
IH CREDIT UNION INC vs LARRY L TODD and MICHAEL TODD | |||||||||
2016Â CVIÂ 00218Â W | TIFFANY MOON | 4/22/2016 | |||||||
TIONTO TABOR vs TIFFANY MOON | |||||||||
2015Â CVEÂ 01081Â W | JAMES E HARDNICK | 4/21/2016 | |||||||
JEFFREY SIMMONS vs JAMES E HARDNICK | |||||||||
2016Â CVIÂ 00289Â E | ALLEN JOHNSON | 4/20/2016 | |||||||
ELLEN REYNOLDS vs ALLEN JOHNSON | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00265Â W | JAMES STATESMAN, ET AL | 4/20/2016 | |||||||
DAYTON SENIOR CARE LLC DBA FRIENDSHIP VILLAGE vs JAMES STATESMAN, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00263Â W | SCHUANTE M HILL, ET AL | 4/20/2016 | |||||||
FELICIA LABOY vs SCHUANTE M HILL, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00262Â W | DESTINY BELFO, ET AL | 4/20/2016 | |||||||
THE INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS CENTER, LLC vs DESTINY BELFO, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00254Â W | AMY MELTON, ET AL | 4/20/2016 | |||||||
GARY RADFOPRD vs AMY MELTON, ET AL | |||||||||
2016Â CVIÂ 00269Â E | JOHN K CAPLINGER | 4/20/2016 | |||||||
JONATHAN HUSKINS vs JOHN K CAPLINGER | |||||||||
2016Â CVGÂ 00329Â E | CLARISSA HOFF | 4/20/2016 | |||||||
MICHAEL B BRISTOW vs CLARISSA HOFF | |||||||||
2015Â CVFÂ 00719Â E | ZACHARY R MCQUEEN | 4/20/2016 | |||||||
DAVID A WEAVER vs ZACHARY R MCQUEEN | |||||||||
2016Â CVHÂ 00232Â W | DON PETIT REGISTRAR BMV | 4/19/2016 | |||||||
DAWN J SMITH vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR BMV | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 804, 805, 806 ... 950, 951, 952 Next |