16303 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVF00578 | MIRANDA MCINTOSH | 4/29/2014 | |||||||
LEBANON EQUINE CLINIC, INC vs MIRANDA MCINTOSH | |||||||||
14CVF00579 | COREY T TEAGUE | 4/29/2014 | |||||||
KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER vs COREY T TEAGUE | |||||||||
14CVG00576 | VINCENT ANDREWS | 4/29/2014 | |||||||
ADARA COMMUNITIES DBA HUNTERS CHASE APARTMENTS vs VINCENT ANDREWS | |||||||||
14CVF00577 | TRVLYN J MATTA | 4/29/2014 | |||||||
LEBANON EQUINE CLINIC, INC vs TRVLYN J MATTA | |||||||||
14CVF00572 | ARIEL MARSHALL | 4/28/2014 | |||||||
DAYTON OSTEOP HOSP ANESTHESIA vs ARIEL MARSHALL | |||||||||
14CVF00573 | TOMMIE S HUTCHINSON | 4/28/2014 | |||||||
CARROLLTON POINTE APTS vs TOMMIE S HUTCHINSON | |||||||||
14CVF00575 | TIMOTHY A AUSTIN | 4/28/2014 | |||||||
CARROLLTON POINTE APTS vs TIMOTHY A AUSTIN | |||||||||
14CVF00584 | LISA V. TAYLOR | 4/28/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs LISA V. TAYLOR | |||||||||
14CVH00574 | MIKE RANKIN, REG | 4/28/2014 | |||||||
JONATHON J MCKOWN vs MIKE RANKIN, REG | |||||||||
14CVI00583 | DAYTON DUTCH LIONS LLC | 4/28/2014 | |||||||
NICHOLAS CERVI vs DAYTON DUTCH LIONS LLC | |||||||||
14CVG00569 | HOLLY BEEKER, ET AL. | 4/25/2014 | |||||||
CURTIS WRIGHT vs HOLLY BEEKER, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVG00571 | JR & C CONSTRUCTION, ET AL | 4/25/2014 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTS vs JR & C CONSTRUCTION, ET AL | |||||||||
14CVG00570 | CHARLES TRAGESSER, ET AL III | 4/25/2014 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs CHARLES TRAGESSER, ET AL III | |||||||||
14CVF00567 | ANNALEE JOHNSON | 4/24/2014 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs ANNALEE JOHNSON | |||||||||
14CVF00568 | AMANDA WHITE | 4/24/2014 | |||||||
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOC., LLC vs AMANDA WHITE | |||||||||
14CVG00564 | ROBERT SIMPSON | 4/24/2014 | |||||||
ESTATE OF HAZEL CARTER C/O BETTY CREECH vs ROBERT SIMPSON | |||||||||
14CVE00552 | RONTE JEVON GRANT | 4/23/2014 | |||||||
WESTERN RESERVE MUTUAL CASUALTY CO AS SUBROGEE OF vs RONTE JEVON GRANT | |||||||||
14CVF00551 | MICHAEL ROSE | 4/23/2014 | |||||||
SENEX SERVICES CORP SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO vs MICHAEL ROSE | |||||||||
14CVF00553 | ANDREW P LUCAS | 4/23/2014 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs ANDREW P LUCAS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 795, 796, 797 ... 814, 815, 816 Next |