16303 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVH00680 | MIKE RANKIN, REG | 5/19/2014 | |||||||
LARRY BLACK vs MIKE RANKIN, REG | |||||||||
14CVF00710 | SHANNON VIETS | 5/19/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs SHANNON VIETS | |||||||||
14CVH00659 | MIKE RANKIN, REG | 5/16/2014 | |||||||
JOHN F MASON vs MIKE RANKIN, REG | |||||||||
14CVG00657 | ALVIN W. VANCIL, ET AL. | 5/15/2014 | |||||||
ADARA COMMUNITIES DBA HUNTERS CHASE APARTMENTS vs ALVIN W. VANCIL, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVF00655 | KELLY CALLENTINE | 5/14/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs KELLY CALLENTINE | |||||||||
14CVG00656 | AMANDA SALLY, ET AL. | 5/14/2014 | |||||||
KATHY LAMBERT vs AMANDA SALLY, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVG00658 | MATTHEW ENGLE, ET AL. | 5/14/2014 | |||||||
JOSEPH W WALKER vs MATTHEW ENGLE, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVI00654 | SPEEDWAY C/O NICOLE OVERBAY | 5/13/2014 | |||||||
GAIL REAGAN vs SPEEDWAY C/O NICOLE OVERBAY | |||||||||
14CVG00642 | AMANDA MCGUIRE, ET AL. | 5/9/2014 | |||||||
IDEAL MOBILE HOMES SALES & PARK INC vs AMANDA MCGUIRE, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVG00650 | HOUSE OF HARRISON | 5/9/2014 | |||||||
AMERICAN HEALTH & FITNESS, LLC C/O DOUGLAS THOMPSON vs HOUSE OF HARRISON | |||||||||
14CVG00651 | BRENDA K ROBERTS | 5/9/2014 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON PREMIER MANAGEMEN vs BRENDA K ROBERTS | |||||||||
14CVI00649 | CHRISTIE CLAYTOR, GUARDIAN OF DESTINY CLAYTOR, MI... | 5/9/2014 | |||||||
EBONY TUCK vs CHRISTIE CLAYTOR, GUARDIAN OF DESTINY CLAYTOR, MI... | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 791, 792, 793 ... 814, 815, 816 Next |