17778 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVG00854 | KELLY TOOL, ET AL. | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
PINEVIEW PINES ESTATES vs KELLY TOOL, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00855 | BILLIE JO HALL, ET AL | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
PINEVIEW PINES ESTATES vs BILLIE JO HALL, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG00856 | CAROL J. ROSE, ET AL. | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
THOMAS L REAGAN vs CAROL J. ROSE, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00857 | RYAN C. STEINWAY | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
THOMAS L REAGAN vs RYAN C. STEINWAY | |||||||||
15CVG00858 | JENNIFER L. CADE | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
ARM&T HOLDINGS, LLC vs JENNIFER L. CADE | |||||||||
15CVG00853 | BRITTANY WALSH, ET AL. | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
HIDDEN LAKES APARTMENTS vs BRITTANY WALSH, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVI00850 | ASHLEIGH WAGNER | 6/15/2015 | |||||||
SCOTT HATFIELD vs ASHLEIGH WAGNER | |||||||||
15CVH00848 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 6/15/2015 | |||||||
KATHRYN M BAKER vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVG00849 | CHRISTINA SELBY | 6/15/2015 | |||||||
BEVERLY BRIGGS vs CHRISTINA SELBY | |||||||||
15CVF00845 | PAUL W ZANOWICK | 6/14/2015 | |||||||
FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA C/O KIRSCHENBAUM, PHILLIPS & vs PAUL W ZANOWICK | |||||||||
15CVF00846 | JENNIFER L. COOMER | 6/14/2015 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs JENNIFER L. COOMER | |||||||||
15CVF00847 | EAN HUTCHISON | 6/14/2015 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION vs EAN HUTCHISON | |||||||||
15CVG00843 | LAKEISHA GIBSON, ET AL. | 6/14/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APTS. vs LAKEISHA GIBSON, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00844 | MARCY RUTLEDGE, ET AL. | 6/14/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APTS. vs MARCY RUTLEDGE, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00842 | JENNIFER HOAG | 6/12/2015 | |||||||
MEAFELIA B PASCUAL vs JENNIFER HOAG | |||||||||
15CVH00836 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 6/11/2015 | |||||||
SAM SHIELDS vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 758, 759, 760 ... 887, 888, 889 Next |