17778 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVG00955 | BRADY DUCHEMIN, ET AL. | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LMTD PARTNERSHIP vs BRADY DUCHEMIN, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00940 | JOSHUA HAYES, ET AL. | 7/6/2015 | |||||||
TOBE MANOR PROPERTIES, LLC vs JOSHUA HAYES, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00941 | TONYA WATTS-ROSE, ET AL. | 7/6/2015 | |||||||
KATHY LAMBERT vs TONYA WATTS-ROSE, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVH00939 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 7/6/2015 | |||||||
LINDSEY A WENDLING vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVF00938 | CHARLOTTE A. CARRENDER | 7/2/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs CHARLOTTE A. CARRENDER | |||||||||
15CVI00937 | WILLIAM D. POFF | 7/2/2015 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MGMT INC. FOR EAGLE RIDGE APTS vs WILLIAM D. POFF | |||||||||
15CVH00935 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 7/1/2015 | |||||||
CHASSITY HARVELL vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVH00936 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 7/1/2015 | |||||||
JENNIFER R MILLER vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVF00926 | CASSANDRA L. WATERHOUSE | 6/30/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs CASSANDRA L. WATERHOUSE | |||||||||
15CVI00930 | VILLAS AT ARBORETUM | 6/30/2015 | |||||||
RAOUL T FOSSI vs VILLAS AT ARBORETUM | |||||||||
15CVG00932 | MOLLY CONN, ET AL | 6/30/2015 | |||||||
FEQ PROPERTIES vs MOLLY CONN, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG00931 | ROD PENNINGTON, ET AL | 6/30/2015 | |||||||
EQUITY TRUST CO. CUSTODIAN FBO ARTHUR D. PARADISE, IRA. AND vs ROD PENNINGTON, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG00929 | SHARON KNIGHT, ET AL | 6/30/2015 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA COVEY RUN APARTMENTS vs SHARON KNIGHT, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG00928 | WALTER SPARKS, ET AL | 6/30/2015 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA COVEY RUN APARTMENTS vs WALTER SPARKS, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG00927 | TONYA BENNETT, ET AL | 6/30/2015 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA COVEY RUN APARTMENTS vs TONYA BENNETT, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG00924 | THEA DEVOE, ET AL. | 6/30/2015 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS. vs THEA DEVOE, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00923 | JOSH BAYER, ET AL | 6/30/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTS vs JOSH BAYER, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVF00925 | CATHY L. SEALS | 6/30/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs CATHY L. SEALS | |||||||||
15CVE00933 | DELECCA L. STEPHENS | 6/30/2015 | |||||||
ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY vs DELECCA L. STEPHENS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 752, 753, 754 ... 887, 888, 889 Next |