17778 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVH00994 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 7/20/2015 | |||||||
MICHAEL GEARHARDT vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVG00961 | BUFFY COMBS, ET AL. | 7/10/2015 | |||||||
940 11TH LLC BY: PEPZEE REALTY, INC. vs BUFFY COMBS, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVI00960 | ELLEN HUSKEY | 7/10/2015 | |||||||
CHRIS MILLS vs ELLEN HUSKEY | |||||||||
15CVG00958 | SUSIE WILLIAMS | 7/9/2015 | |||||||
ANTHONY STAUB vs SUSIE WILLIAMS | |||||||||
15CVH00959 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 7/9/2015 | |||||||
CHRISTOPHER GRIBB vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVG00945 | CRAIG NEWMAN, ET AL. | 7/8/2015 | |||||||
ROBERT RECK vs CRAIG NEWMAN, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00957 | TERRA WHEELER, ET AL. | 7/8/2015 | |||||||
R-HAUS PROPERTIES III, LLC vs TERRA WHEELER, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVH00956 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 7/8/2015 | |||||||
TIMOTHY M BARKER vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVG00954 | ALYSSA ASHWORTH, ET AL. | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LMTD PARTNERSHIP vs ALYSSA ASHWORTH, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00953 | DORIS JONES, ET AL. | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LMTD PARTNERSHIP vs DORIS JONES, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00952 | ELIZABETH EVERSOLE, ET AL. | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LMTD PARTNERSHIP vs ELIZABETH EVERSOLE, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00951 | BOBBY ANDERSON, ET AL. | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LMTD PARTNERSHIP vs BOBBY ANDERSON, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00950 | JUSTINE STEELE, ET AL. | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LMTD PARTNERSHIP vs JUSTINE STEELE, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00949 | ELIZABETH BEEBE, ET AL. | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LMTD PARTNERSHIP vs ELIZABETH BEEBE, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00948 | AMBER WILLIAMS, ET AL | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LMTD PARTNERSHIP vs AMBER WILLIAMS, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG00947 | BRIAN JACKSON, ET AL. | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs BRIAN JACKSON, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00946 | JOSHUA GATES, ET AL. | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs JOSHUA GATES, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00944 | NELLIE WOOLERY, ET AL. | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
LYONS GATE APARTMENTS vs NELLIE WOOLERY, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00943 | RANDA OSBORNE, ET AL. | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS UNLIMITED vs RANDA OSBORNE, ET AL. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 751, 752, 753 ... 887, 888, 889 Next |