16303 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVF01511 | ZORAIDA A. WILLIAMS AKA ZORAIDA RODRIQUEZ | 10/10/2014 | |||||||
FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, LLC vs ZORAIDA A. WILLIAMS AKA ZORAIDA RODRIQUEZ | |||||||||
14CVF01512 | DONNA DEATON | 10/10/2014 | |||||||
ACCOUNT ADJUSTMENT BUREAU vs DONNA DEATON | |||||||||
14CVH01508 | MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 10/10/2014 | |||||||
KIMBERLY L WILSON vs MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
14CVH01513 | MIKE RANKIN, REG | 10/10/2014 | |||||||
JOSEPH O BECKER JR vs MIKE RANKIN, REG | |||||||||
14CVF01510 | AMY L. HONIOUS AKA AMY L. HINSHAW | 10/10/2014 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, NA AS SUCCESSOR TO TARGET NATL BANK vs AMY L. HONIOUS AKA AMY L. HINSHA... | |||||||||
14CVF01502 | MICHELLE R TORRES | 10/9/2014 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs MICHELLE R TORRES | |||||||||
14CVF01503 | CHRISTOPHER LAWSON | 10/9/2014 | |||||||
OKINUS, INC. C/O DONAHUE LAW GROUP, LLC vs CHRISTOPHER LAWSON | |||||||||
14CVF01504 | DARLENE MILLER | 10/9/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs DARLENE MILLER | |||||||||
14CVG01501 | ANDREA HILL, ET AL. | 10/9/2014 | |||||||
940 11TH LLC BY: PEPZEE REALTY, INC. vs ANDREA HILL, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVH01495 | MIKE RANKIN | 10/8/2014 | |||||||
CAMILIA KYLE vs MIKE RANKIN | |||||||||
14CVI01496 | ASHLEY SMITH | 10/8/2014 | |||||||
PAUL BAKER vs ASHLEY SMITH | |||||||||
14CVH01497 | MIKE RANKIN, REG | 10/8/2014 | |||||||
BRANDON L PINSON vs MIKE RANKIN, REG | |||||||||
14CVG01498 | BRYAN PAVY | 10/8/2014 | |||||||
MEAFELIA B PASCUAL vs BRYAN PAVY | |||||||||
14CVG01494 | CARROLLTON POINTE APTS. | 10/7/2014 | |||||||
TIERRA ELLICOTT vs CARROLLTON POINTE APTS. | |||||||||
14CVG01499 | GARY HERANDEZ, ET AL. | 10/7/2014 | |||||||
ROBERT J. RECK vs GARY HERANDEZ, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVG01500 | JESSICA BLEVINS, ET AL. | 10/7/2014 | |||||||
ROBERT RECK vs JESSICA BLEVINS, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVF01490 | JERRY LUNDERGAN, INDV. AND DBA THE LUNDERGAN FROU... | 10/6/2014 | |||||||
MOODY'S OF DAYTON, INC. vs JERRY LUNDERGAN, INDV. AND DBA THE LUNDERGAN FROU... | |||||||||
14CVH01491 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 10/6/2014 | |||||||
LINDA GOOD vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
14CVH01492 | MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 10/6/2014 | |||||||
JOSHUA J SMITH vs MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 746, 747, 748 ... 814, 815, 816 Next |