17778 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVG01117 | YVONNE MATHEWS, ET AL | 8/11/2015 | |||||||
MIR ALI vs YVONNE MATHEWS, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01116 | DOUGLAS CALICOAT, ET AL | 8/11/2015 | |||||||
EAGLE RIDGE APARTMENTS C/O SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs DOUGLAS CALICOAT, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVF01109 | NICOLE HARLEMAN | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs NICOLE HARLEMAN | |||||||||
15CVF01110 | HARLEY W. DIXON | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs HARLEY W. DIXON | |||||||||
15CVF01111 | JEREMY D. BROCK | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
SECURITY NATIONAL BANK, DIVISION OF THE PARK NATIONAL BA vs JEREMY D. BROCK | |||||||||
15CVH01113 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
APRIL NEWTON vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVH01114 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
LEASA D MILLER-BACHER vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVI01112 | LAUREN MACKENZIE | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
KENNETH F. SUTTER vs LAUREN MACKENZIE | |||||||||
15CVF01107 | JEWELL JESSUP | 8/7/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs JEWELL JESSUP | |||||||||
15CVF01108 | BEVERLY R. NEWTON | 8/7/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs BEVERLY R. NEWTON | |||||||||
15CVF01105 | SARAH ORNELAS | 8/6/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs SARAH ORNELAS | |||||||||
15CVG01106 | JEORGE MONTAGUE, ET AL | 8/6/2015 | |||||||
T & B REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, L vs JEORGE MONTAGUE, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVF01095 | JOSHUA J. SMITH | 8/5/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs JOSHUA J. SMITH | |||||||||
15CVF01096 | LEANNE DAVIS | 8/5/2015 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS INC. vs LEANNE DAVIS | |||||||||
15CVF01097 | CHERI L. BRYANT | 8/5/2015 | |||||||
BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOL NO 15 LLC vs CHERI L. BRYANT | |||||||||
15CVF01099 | DAWN D. BOWLES AKA DAWN D. GOINS | 8/5/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs DAWN D. BOWLES AKA DAWN D.... | |||||||||
15CVG01100 | GARY HONIOUS, ET AL | 8/5/2015 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES MAPLE RUN vs GARY HONIOUS, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01101 | VIRGINIA FOSTER, ET AL | 8/5/2015 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES MAPLE RUN vs VIRGINIA FOSTER, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01102 | KELLEY JOHNSON, ET AL | 8/5/2015 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES MAPLE RUN vs KELLEY JOHNSON, ET AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 745, 746, 747 ... 887, 888, 889 Next |