17778 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVI01476 | JULIA ROSE | 10/23/2015 | |||||||
CHERYL CRAFT vs JULIA ROSE | |||||||||
15CVG01477 | CINDY PITTMAN | 10/22/2015 | |||||||
GREATWORKS MGMT SALLY HARMON vs CINDY PITTMAN | |||||||||
15CVH01479 | MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL RESOURC | 10/22/2015 | |||||||
LISA WILLIFORD vs MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL RESOURC | |||||||||
15CVG01465 | KAILA MARIE WRIGHT, ET AL | 10/21/2015 | |||||||
CARROLLTON POINTE APARTMENTS LLC vs KAILA MARIE WRIGHT, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01470 | BRIAN HOWARD, ET AL | 10/21/2015 | |||||||
ARNOLD SMITH vs BRIAN HOWARD, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01471 | DARRON DAVIS | 10/21/2015 | |||||||
ALICE YEH vs DARRON DAVIS | |||||||||
15CVG01472 | LISA STALEY | 10/21/2015 | |||||||
PLAZA MIAMISBURG, LLC vs LISA STALEY | |||||||||
15CVI01473 | CHASE WEST LLC ANTHONY WEST-OWNER | 10/21/2015 | |||||||
TAJUL PORDAN vs CHASE WEST LLC ANTHONY WEST-OWNER | |||||||||
15CVG01466 | JUDY COBB, ET AL | 10/20/2015 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP vs JUDY COBB, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01461 | MARIAH WEST, ET AL | 10/19/2015 | |||||||
AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs MARIAH WEST, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01460 | CHEY-ANNE L. WILSON, ET AL | 10/19/2015 | |||||||
AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs CHEY-ANNE L. WILSON, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01459 | KELLY TOOL, ET AL. | 10/19/2015 | |||||||
PINEVIEW PINES ESTATES vs KELLY TOOL, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG01458 | SIERRA WILLIAMSON, ET AL | 10/19/2015 | |||||||
PINEVIEW PINES ESTATES vs SIERRA WILLIAMSON, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01457 | KELLY KEDANIS, ET AL | 10/19/2015 | |||||||
MAXIMUM INVESTMENT GROUP, INC. vs KELLY KEDANIS, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVF01490 | JASMINE CHAMBERS | 10/19/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JASMINE CHAMBERS | |||||||||
15CVF01489 | MARY H DOUGLAS | 10/19/2015 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY vs MARY H DOUGLAS | |||||||||
15CVF01469 | CHRISTOPHER E LAMB | 10/19/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE L vs CHRISTOPHER E LAMB | |||||||||
15CVF01468 | JANE KLOECKER AKA JANA R BOYS, JANA R | 10/19/2015 | |||||||
RAZOR CAPITAL, LLC FORMER OBLIGEE OF CREDIT ONE BAN vs JANE KLOECKER AKA JANA R BOYS... | |||||||||
15CVF01467 | LISA RYLE AKA LISA C FREEMAN | 10/19/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC FORMER OBLIGEE OF CREDIT ONE BAN vs LISA RYLE AKA LISA C FREEMAN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 731, 732, 733 ... 887, 888, 889 Next |