16303 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVI00184 | MATTHEW HEIN | 2/5/2015 | |||||||
THOMPSON EXCAVATING vs MATTHEW HEIN | |||||||||
15CVF00177 | ANTHONY BALSAMO | 2/4/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs ANTHONY BALSAMO | |||||||||
15CVF00175 | TRACEE L. ONGELL | 2/3/2015 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs TRACEE L. ONGELL | |||||||||
15CVF00176 | RONALD L. BAILEY | 2/3/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs RONALD L. BAILEY | |||||||||
15CVG00174 | SHIRELL GARRETT, ET AL. | 2/3/2015 | |||||||
CARROLLTON POINTE APARTMENTS, LL vs SHIRELL GARRETT, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVI00172 | CASSANDRA RITCHIE | 2/3/2015 | |||||||
PETSUITES OF AMERICA, INC vs CASSANDRA RITCHIE | |||||||||
15CVH00168 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 2/2/2015 | |||||||
CHRISTOPHER S WHITT vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVI00167 | GLENN HIATT | 2/2/2015 | |||||||
RICHARD L. COX SR vs GLENN HIATT | |||||||||
15CVH00171 | MONTGOMERY COUNTY RESOURCE CENTE | 2/2/2015 | |||||||
DIANA SLIVINSKI vs MONTGOMERY COUNTY RESOURCE CENTE | |||||||||
15CVG00173 | KYRA PATTERSON, ET AL. | 2/2/2015 | |||||||
K&E PROPERTY MANAGEMENT FOR: MINSTREL PROPERTIES vs KYRA PATTERSON, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00170 | CARROLLTON POINTE APTS. C/O SHELLY DOTTILLIS | 2/2/2015 | |||||||
DALE WILSON vs CARROLLTON POINTE APTS. C/O SHELLY DOTTILLIS | |||||||||
15CVG00169 | ANGELA WILLIAMS | 2/2/2015 | |||||||
SAMAAN VENTURES,LLC C/O CHARLIE SAMAAN vs ANGELA WILLIAMS | |||||||||
15CVF00180 | MEAGAN TAYLOR | 2/2/2015 | |||||||
SECURITY NATIONAL BANK DIVISION OF THE PARK NATIONAL BA vs MEAGAN TAYLOR | |||||||||
15CVF00151 | ROBERT JAMES | 1/30/2015 | |||||||
WILLOW GREEN CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. vs ROBERT JAMES | |||||||||
15CVF00154 | MARY R. WAGERS | 1/30/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs MARY R. WAGERS | |||||||||
15CVF00155 | ALI ABUAMREH | 1/30/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES LLC vs ALI ABUAMREH | |||||||||
15CVF00156 | CARLOS LOPEZ | 1/30/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs CARLOS LOPEZ | |||||||||
15CVF00157 | PAMELA CASEY | 1/30/2015 | |||||||
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC. C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATE CO. LPA vs PAMELA CASEY | |||||||||
15CVF00163 | MARK ALLEN | 1/30/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs MARK ALLEN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 715, 716, 717 ... 814, 815, 816 Next |