16303 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVF00393 | ANDREA OROZCO | 3/17/2015 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs ANDREA OROZCO | |||||||||
15CVF00394 | TERRI L. BOBAK | 3/17/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs TERRI L. BOBAK | |||||||||
15CVF00395 | MICHAEL BISTREK | 3/17/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs MICHAEL BISTREK | |||||||||
15CVF00397 | MYRON D. DABE | 3/17/2015 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs MYRON D. DABE | |||||||||
15CVF00398 | DEAN MARKER | 3/17/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OH AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs DEAN MARKER | |||||||||
15CVF00399 | JAMES T BROCK | 3/17/2015 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs JAMES T BROCK | |||||||||
15CVG00374 | GLEN SPURLOCK, ET AL. | 3/17/2015 | |||||||
GEORGE E MARTIN vs GLEN SPURLOCK, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00375 | HAYLEY R. DAILEY, ET AL. | 3/17/2015 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON PREMIER MANAGEMENT vs HAYLEY R. DAILEY, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVF00392 | CHAD LAYTON | 3/17/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs CHAD LAYTON | |||||||||
15CVI00373 | AAMCO/DOUBLE BEE REPAIR | 3/16/2015 | |||||||
JIM MENGES vs AAMCO/DOUBLE BEE REPAIR | |||||||||
15CVE00371 | KENYA TAYLOR | 3/13/2015 | |||||||
WESTFIELD NATIONAL INSURANCE CO. SUBROGEE OF JAMES HOLTHAUS vs KENYA TAYLOR | |||||||||
15CVH00370 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 3/13/2015 | |||||||
MATTHEW J FULLER vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVF00372 | SHARON SHEETS | 3/13/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs SHARON SHEETS | |||||||||
15CVG00367 | AIRYELLE GUY, ET AL. | 3/12/2015 | |||||||
HIDDEN LAKES APARTMENTS vs AIRYELLE GUY, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG00368 | JASHARA JENKINS, ET AL. | 3/12/2015 | |||||||
LYONS GATE APARTMENTS vs JASHARA JENKINS, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVF00361 | KANDY MCKINNEY | 3/11/2015 | |||||||
CONVERGENCE RECEIVABLES, LC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOC CO. LPA vs KANDY MCKINNEY | |||||||||
15CVF00362 | AMY L HONIOUS (AKA AMY L. TALMADGE) | 3/11/2015 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs AMY L HONIOUS (AKA AMY L. TALMADGE) | |||||||||
15CVF00363 | VERNON CLARK | 3/11/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DB IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs VERNON CLARK | |||||||||
15CVF00364 | MAGED ISSA | 3/11/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs MAGED ISSA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 704, 705, 706 ... 814, 815, 816 Next |