17778 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVG00221 | GREG FRANKLIN, ET AL | 2/23/2016 | |||||||
WALLICK PROPERTIES MIDWEST, LLC DBA VILLAS AT ARBORETUM vs GREG FRANKLIN, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00222 | TAYLOR WEIDLE, ET AL | 2/23/2016 | |||||||
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS LTD. DBA PRESERVE AT SAGEBROOK vs TAYLOR WEIDLE, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00223 | STEVE MARTIN, JR, ET AL. | 2/23/2016 | |||||||
FARMERS, LTD vs STEVE MARTIN, JR, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG00224 | JOY DANIEL, ET AL. | 2/23/2016 | |||||||
EAGLE RIDGE APARTMENTS C/O SUNDANCE PROPERTY MGMT, INC. vs JOY DANIEL, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG00225 | AMBER KWIATKOWSKI, ET AL | 2/23/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA MIAMISBURG BY THE MALL vs AMBER KWIATKOWSKI, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00228 | MELINDA MILLER, ET AL | 2/23/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APARTMENTS vs MELINDA MILLER, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00229 | ALEXIS STORY, ET AL | 2/23/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APARTMENTS vs ALEXIS STORY, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH00234 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 2/23/2016 | |||||||
DOUGLAS PALEN vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVG00220 | BRETT VANCE, ET AL | 2/23/2016 | |||||||
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS LTD. DBA PRESERVE AT SAGEBROOK vs BRETT VANCE, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH00218 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 2/22/2016 | |||||||
KAITLYNN PETERS vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVH00217 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 2/22/2016 | |||||||
STEVEN A WEIMER vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH00213 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 2/19/2016 | |||||||
JAMES F BUSH JR vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVF00205 | MICHAEL PEITZ | 2/18/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs MICHAEL PEITZ | |||||||||
16CVF00206 | DONALD NAPIER | 2/18/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs DONALD NAPIER | |||||||||
16CVG00204 | GIOVANNA RICHARDS, ET AL. | 2/18/2016 | |||||||
MAD RIVER APARTMENTS vs GIOVANNA RICHARDS, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG00211 | JESSICA BIGGS | 2/18/2016 | |||||||
CHARLENE DECAMP vs JESSICA BIGGS | |||||||||
16CVH00210 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 2/18/2016 | |||||||
AMANDA M CRAWFORD vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVH00212 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 2/18/2016 | |||||||
EDWARD CHRISTOPHER COLEMAN vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVE00183 | BELL'S PREFERRED RESTORATION | 2/17/2016 | |||||||
J-ANNE MASONRY, LLC vs BELL'S PREFERRED RESTORATION | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 699, 700, 701 ... 887, 888, 889 Next |