17778 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVH00279 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 3/4/2016 | |||||||
TANIQUA M GRETZINGER vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH00276 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 3/3/2016 | |||||||
ERIK S AIKEN vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH00277 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 3/3/2016 | |||||||
ANDREA BRANSCOMB vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVI00278 | JEFF SCHMITT CHEVROLET LTD | 3/3/2016 | |||||||
JAMEELAH AL-AMIN vs JEFF SCHMITT CHEVROLET LTD | |||||||||
16CVG00275 | ADRIAN ROBERTSON, ET AL | 3/2/2016 | |||||||
MIR ALI vs ADRIAN ROBERTSON, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH00272 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 3/2/2016 | |||||||
DESHANNON N BRISSEY vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH00273 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 3/2/2016 | |||||||
RUSSELL L FOUST vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVI00274 | TERESA RECKER | 3/2/2016 | |||||||
ART WEAD vs TERESA RECKER | |||||||||
16CVF00270 | BRIAN KATTMAN | 3/1/2016 | |||||||
WRIGHT-PATT CREDIT UNION vs BRIAN KATTMAN | |||||||||
16CVG00267 | ANDREW T VAUGHN, ET AL | 3/1/2016 | |||||||
JOHN G HAYES vs ANDREW T VAUGHN, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVF00271 | JASON ISENBARGER | 3/1/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs JASON ISENBARGER | |||||||||
16CVF00269 | KATIE REESE | 3/1/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs KATIE REESE | |||||||||
16CVF00268 | JEANIE HANSHELL | 3/1/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs JEANIE HANSHELL | |||||||||
16CVF00261 | KIMBERLY CRUTCHER | 2/29/2016 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs KIMBERLY CRUTCHER | |||||||||
16CVF00262 | PURITY L. CHITWOOD | 2/29/2016 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs PURITY L. CHITWOOD | |||||||||
16CVF00265 | PAUL B. HARTING | 2/29/2016 | |||||||
OSTERMAN'S JEWELERS vs PAUL B. HARTING | |||||||||
16CVG00260 | LUKE BAKER, ET AL. | 2/29/2016 | |||||||
ALMEDIA COURT, LLC vs LUKE BAKER, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG00263 | JOSHUA A. LONGSTRETH, ET AL | 2/29/2016 | |||||||
DAVID D. HICKS vs JOSHUA A. LONGSTRETH, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH00264 | MARGARET M. OGORMAN | 2/29/2016 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO DEPT. OF JOB & FAMILY SERVICES vs MARGARET M. OGORMAN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 697, 698, 699 ... 887, 888, 889 Next |