17778 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVH00362 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 3/16/2016 | |||||||
SHANE VELTE vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVI00361 | ROYAL JORDANIAN AIRLINES | 3/16/2016 | |||||||
SAMIR ALKHASAWNEH vs ROYAL JORDANIAN AIRLINES | |||||||||
16CVH00360 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 3/16/2016 | |||||||
JUAN CARLOS SALDANA vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVG00333 | JULIANNA TURNER, ET AL | 3/15/2016 | |||||||
TOBE MANOR PROPERTIES, LLC vs JULIANNA TURNER, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00334 | BRIAN THOMPSON, ET AL | 3/15/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTS vs BRIAN THOMPSON, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00336 | JONATHON JENKINS, ET AL | 3/15/2016 | |||||||
PATRICIA JENKINS vs JONATHON JENKINS, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00342 | KAREN HOLLON, ET AL | 3/15/2016 | |||||||
PSP IDEAL MOBILE HOME PARK, LLC vs KAREN HOLLON, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00343 | TOMMY KLAPPER, ET AL | 3/15/2016 | |||||||
PSP IDEAL MOBILE HOME PARK, LLC vs TOMMY KLAPPER, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00344 | JANA LONG, ET AL | 3/15/2016 | |||||||
PSP IDEAL MOBILE HOME PARK, LLC vs JANA LONG, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00345 | KIMBERLY VIARS, ET AL. | 3/15/2016 | |||||||
PSP IDEAL MOBILE HOME PARK, LLC vs KIMBERLY VIARS, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVF00338 | ADAM WALL AKA ADAM R. WALL | 3/14/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs ADAM WALL AKA ADAM R. WAL... | |||||||||
16CVH00332 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 3/14/2016 | |||||||
ANDREW S CLARK vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH00331 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 3/14/2016 | |||||||
SAMANTHA TIPTON vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVF00341 | STACEY DUBOISE AKA STACEY L. BARNETT | 3/14/2016 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs STACEY DUBOISE AKA STACEY L. BARNETT | |||||||||
16CVF00340 | BRIDGETTE N. HOFFMAN | 3/14/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs BRIDGETTE N. HOFFMAN | |||||||||
16CVF00339 | ANITA L. TRENT | 3/14/2016 | |||||||
KETTERING HEALTH NETWORK vs ANITA L. TRENT | |||||||||
16CVH00327 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 3/11/2016 | |||||||
VICTORIA L VON PONGRACZ vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVF00299 | CARL GILBERT | 3/10/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs CARL GILBERT | |||||||||
16CVF00300 | JOHN MITZKA | 3/10/2016 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP vs JOHN MITZKA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 694, 695, 696 ... 887, 888, 889 Next |