17805 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVF00521 | CARLOS UZHCA | 4/12/2016 | |||||||
vs CARLOS UZHCA | |||||||||
16CVF00520 | DANIELLE J. BROWER | 4/12/2016 | |||||||
vs DANIELLE J. BROWER | |||||||||
16CVF00508 | DEANN M. HARRIS | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
vs DEANN M. HARRIS | |||||||||
16CVF00509 | TAMMY BRADEN | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
vs TAMMY BRADEN | |||||||||
16CVF00511 | DARLENE NICHOLS | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
vs DARLENE NICHOLS | |||||||||
16CVF00513 | TONY RUSSELL | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
vs TONY RUSSELL | |||||||||
16CVF00515 | BENNY K. SHEPHERD | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
vs BENNY K. SHEPHERD | |||||||||
16CVF00516 | KATHLEEN G. GAYHEART | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
vs KATHLEEN G. GAYHEART | |||||||||
16CVF00518 | LEO J. DIONNE JR | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
vs LEO J. DIONNE JR | |||||||||
16CVH00505 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 4/11/2016 | |||||||
vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH00501 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 4/8/2016 | |||||||
JASON J HILL vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVH00503 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 4/8/2016 | |||||||
ERIC W CARTER vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH00502 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 4/8/2016 | |||||||
RYAN M JOHNSON vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVG00498 | BARB PERDUE, ET AL. | 4/7/2016 | |||||||
ROBERT RECK vs BARB PERDUE, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG00499 | TABITHA CLARK, ET AL. | 4/7/2016 | |||||||
ROBERT RECK vs TABITHA CLARK, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVH00496 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 4/7/2016 | |||||||
LINDSEY A WENDLING vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVH00497 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 4/7/2016 | |||||||
AUSTIN DOYLE vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVH00500 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 4/7/2016 | |||||||
WILLIAM M WARD vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVF00472 | ELIZABETH ROWLES | 4/6/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs ELIZABETH ROWLES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 689, 690, 691 ... 889, 890, 891 Next |