9895 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVF00868 | ANGEL RODRIGUEZ | 7/21/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs ANGEL RODRIGUEZ | |||||||||
14CVF00096 | SHILANDO L CONNER | 7/15/2014 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON SURGERY CENTER vs SHILANDO L CONNER | |||||||||
14CVI00830 | DUSTIN WALTER | 7/15/2014 | |||||||
JIM JUTRAS vs DUSTIN WALTER | |||||||||
14CVI00838 | STONE'S AUTO SERVICE | 7/15/2014 | |||||||
MICHAEL MILLS vs STONE'S AUTO SERVICE | |||||||||
14CVI00845 | DORATHY J HOOPER | 7/15/2014 | |||||||
KELSEY A SARGENT vs DORATHY J HOOPER | |||||||||
14CVF00444 | DAVID A GEORGE | 7/11/2014 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs DAVID A GEORGE | |||||||||
14CVF00605 | LISA A CRAFT | 7/10/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs LISA A CRAFT | |||||||||
14CVF01008 | VIVIAN HOWARD | 7/10/2014 | |||||||
PRIMUS AUTO FINANCIAL SERV vs VIVIAN HOWARD | |||||||||
14CVF00757 | RAY S. RUSSELL | 7/10/2014 | |||||||
FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs RAY S. RUSSELL | |||||||||
14CVF00733 | DONNA C NEWCOMB | 7/10/2014 | |||||||
FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs DONNA C NEWCOMB | |||||||||
14CVF00647 | TARA PITTMAN | 7/10/2014 | |||||||
AT&T C/O SLOVIN & ASSOC. CO. LPA vs TARA PITTMAN | |||||||||
14CVF00609 | CHELSEA L. TRAVIS | 7/10/2014 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs CHELSEA L. TRAVIS | |||||||||
14CVF00431 | JONATHAN LAURENT | 7/10/2014 | |||||||
CHRISTOPHER HARBAUGH vs JONATHAN LAURENT | |||||||||
14CVF00375 | MAJIDULLAH KHAN | 7/10/2014 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND, LP ASSIGNEE OF US BANK NAT'L ASSOC vs MAJIDULLAH KHAN | |||||||||
14CVF00370 | JIMMY WALLER | 7/10/2014 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs JIMMY WALLER | |||||||||
14CVF00346 | ANTONIO CASEY | 7/10/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs ANTONIO CASEY | |||||||||
14CVI00966 | TYRICE JONES | 7/9/2014 | |||||||
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs TYRICE JONES | |||||||||
14CVI00777 | WILLIAM WILSON | 7/8/2014 | |||||||
GERALD E GUNNOE vs WILLIAM WILSON | |||||||||
14CVI00789 | DANA TACKETT | 7/8/2014 | |||||||
COUNTRY SQUARE PROPERTIES vs DANA TACKETT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 492, 493, 494, 495 Next |