9895 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVF01832 | JASON W. HULL | 2/9/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs JASON W. HULL | |||||||||
14CVF01812 | DORA L. MYERS | 2/9/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs DORA L. MYERS | |||||||||
14CVF01195 | KIMBERLY WALKER | 2/5/2015 | |||||||
RENT- A- CENTER, INC. vs KIMBERLY WALKER | |||||||||
14CVF01874 | ANTHONY WAGNER | 2/5/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs ANTHONY WAGNER | |||||||||
14CVI00889 | JOSEPH E. WYANT III | 2/5/2015 | |||||||
TAMMY JORDAN vs JOSEPH E. WYANT III | |||||||||
14CVF01739 | DONNA J SNIDER | 2/3/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs DONNA J SNIDER | |||||||||
06CVH00917 | LISA J BAKER | 2/3/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK vs LISA J BAKER | |||||||||
14CVF01708 | DAVID E STEMP | 2/3/2015 | |||||||
STERLING JEWELERS INC. DBA JARED-GALLERIA OF JEWELRY vs DAVID E STEMP | |||||||||
14CVF01603 | STACIE FINLEY | 2/3/2015 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs STACIE FINLEY | |||||||||
14CVF01319 | KENNETH ROBINSON | 2/3/2015 | |||||||
SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES, LLC vs KENNETH ROBINSON | |||||||||
14CVF00721 | FRANK VANSKOYCK | 2/3/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs FRANK VANSKOYCK | |||||||||
14CVE01594 | JOSHUA C. RAMBO | 2/3/2015 | |||||||
ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE vs JOSHUA C. RAMBO | |||||||||
14CVF00912 | DOROTHY V CAPERS | 1/30/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs DOROTHY V CAPERS | |||||||||
14CVF01474 | JAMEY ARMSTRONG | 1/30/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JAMEY ARMSTRONG | |||||||||
14CVF01506 | EDWARD WYSONG | 1/30/2015 | |||||||
JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIE vs EDWARD WYSONG | |||||||||
14CVF01887 | DANIEL BURKE | 1/30/2015 | |||||||
ROOFTEK ROOFING SUPPLIES, INC. vs DANIEL BURKE | |||||||||
14CVF01312 | AARON PERRY | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs AARON PERRY | |||||||||
14CVF01695 | MORGAN M MCKEE | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
CODE CREDIT UNION, INC. AN OHIO NON-PROFIT CORPORATION vs MORGAN M MCKEE | |||||||||
14CVF01858 | STACEY L. GEIGER | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs STACEY L. GEIGER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 471, 472, 473 ... 493, 494, 495 Next |