11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVI01145 | PITA GRILL SALAM ISMAIL/OWNER | 10/25/2017 | |||||||
R. WEIR, INC. vs PITA GRILL SALAM ISMAIL/OWNER | |||||||||
17CVG00256 | KHADEEM HARRISON, ET. AL | 10/24/2017 | |||||||
JAMES CALDWELL vs KHADEEM HARRISON, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG01352 | THOMAS SANDERS, ET. AL | 10/24/2017 | |||||||
JON THOMAS vs THOMAS SANDERS, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVI01211 | TIA VARNEY | 10/24/2017 | |||||||
CHONDA SWANTON vs TIA VARNEY | |||||||||
16CVE00946 | JERRY D BROWN | 10/20/2017 | |||||||
SUN HOMES INC. vs JERRY D BROWN | |||||||||
17CVE00687 | ADAM L. FRESHOUR | 10/20/2017 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs ADAM L. FRESHOUR | |||||||||
17CVF00878 | CLARENCE SPARKS | 10/20/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CLARENCE SPARKS | |||||||||
17CVF00946 | STEPHEN E. SCOTT | 10/20/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs STEPHEN E. SCOTT | |||||||||
17CVF01051 | CHARLES BAILEY, JR. | 10/20/2017 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO INC. vs CHARLES BAILEY, JR. | |||||||||
17CVG00038 | BRIANNA WILSON, ET. AL | 10/18/2017 | |||||||
EAGLE RIDGE TOWNHOMES, LLC. SIIT SUNDANCE PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, vs BRIANNA WILSON, ... | |||||||||
17CVI01160 | D.J. JUSTICE | 10/18/2017 | |||||||
CONSTANCE HOWE vs D.J. JUSTICE | |||||||||
17CVG01229 | LISA DISMUKE, ET AL. | 10/18/2017 | |||||||
THE CONIFERS APARTMENTS vs LISA DISMUKE, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01075 | APRIL LOVELL, ET. AL | 10/18/2017 | |||||||
DEBBIE DUNN AND DELIA MCKENZIE vs APRIL LOVELL, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVF01807 | JENA L. REED | 10/18/2017 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION INC. vs JENA L. REED | |||||||||
17CVF00517 | SHELLY A. SHIVELY | 10/17/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs SHELLY A. SHIVELY | |||||||||
17CVF00637 | SHELDON APO | 10/17/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs SHELDON APO | |||||||||
17CVF00762 | DELOIS M. ALEXANDER | 10/17/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs DELOIS M. ALEXANDER | |||||||||
17CVF00835 | CHRISTOPHER A. RILEY | 10/17/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs CHRISTOPHER A. RILEY | |||||||||
17CVF00850 | HOLLY FLYNN | 10/17/2017 | |||||||
REGIONAL ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs HOLLY FLYNN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 464, 465, 466 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |