11497 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVG00037 | CARL HANSEN, ET AL. | 2/6/2018 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC. DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs CARL HANSEN, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVF01859 | STEVEN W WALLS AKA STEVEN W WALLS JR. | 2/2/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs STEVEN W WALLS ... | |||||||||
17CVF01969 | ADA E. KING | 2/2/2018 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC. vs ADA E. KING | |||||||||
17CVF02055 | AMANDA R DUGGER | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET CORP SERVICES INC. vs AMANDA R DUGGER | |||||||||
17CVF01868 | DAWN GRIFFIN | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DAWN GRIFFIN | |||||||||
17CVF01722 | JARELL KEITH | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JARELL KEITH | |||||||||
17CVF01721 | DION ABERNATHY | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DION ABERNATHY | |||||||||
17CVF01719 | MICHAEL SMITH | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MICHAEL SMITH | |||||||||
17CVF01701 | LISA M HADDIX AKA LISA BARNER AKA LISA NOBLE | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs LISA M HADDIX AKA LISA BARNER AKA LISA NOBLE | |||||||||
17CVF01580 | TONDA MINGUS AKA TONDA WARE AKA TONDA BOHANNON | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TONDA MINGUS AKA TONDA WARE AKA TONDA BOHANNON | |||||||||
17CVF01374 | CHRISTOPHER HARRIS | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs CHRISTOPHER HARRIS | |||||||||
17CVF01889 | RUSTY MOORE | 1/25/2018 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs RUSTY MOORE | |||||||||
17CVF00022 | DANIELLE S. RUBRIGHT | 1/23/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs DANIELLE S. RUBRIGHT | |||||||||
17CVF01047 | JEANNIE HURST AKA JEANNIE M. BURNS | 1/23/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JEANNIE HURST AKA JEANNIE M. BURNS | |||||||||
17CVF01048 | DAWN GRIFFITH | 1/23/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DAWN GRIFFITH | |||||||||
17CVF01054 | DARLENE E. RANDLER | 1/23/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DARLENE E. RANDLER | |||||||||
17CVF01109 | DANIAL BELL | 1/23/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DANIAL BELL | |||||||||
17CVF01155 | RONALD ESTES | 1/23/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs RONALD ESTES | |||||||||
17CVF01244 | ROBERT L. SNIDER | 1/23/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs ROBERT L. SNIDER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 463, 464, 465 ... 573, 574, 575 Next |