11497 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF00280 | ANGELA DUNIGAN | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs ANGELA DUNIGAN | |||||||||
18CVF00366 | CHRISTINA MOORE | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING vs CHRISTINA MOORE | |||||||||
18CVF00076 | ROBBIE HATTON | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs ROBBIE HATTON | |||||||||
17CVF02008 | GWENDOLYN D. MCCLURE | 5/4/2018 | |||||||
APRIL ENTERPRISES INC. vs GWENDOLYN D. MCCLURE | |||||||||
18CVF00180 | STEVE WALLS JR. | 5/4/2018 | |||||||
CALVARY SPV I, LLC vs STEVE WALLS JR. | |||||||||
18CVI00369 | JEANNA PINSON | 5/3/2018 | |||||||
AA CRAVEN BAIL BONDS vs JEANNA PINSON | |||||||||
17CVF01955 | MICHAEL VANDERHORST | 5/2/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs MICHAEL VANDERHORST | |||||||||
18CVF00053 | ERIKA DILLON | 5/2/2018 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION vs ERIKA DILLON | |||||||||
17CVG02037 | HEATHER VOGEL | 5/2/2018 | |||||||
TERI BARNES vs HEATHER VOGEL | |||||||||
18CVI00459 | JAMES L. GRIFFIN | 5/2/2018 | |||||||
ROBERTA CRANK vs JAMES L. GRIFFIN | |||||||||
18CVF00294 | KYLA REYES | 5/1/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING vs KYLA REYES | |||||||||
18CVF00145 | JAMES PFIEFFER | 5/1/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES vs JAMES PFIEFFER | |||||||||
18CVF00029 | MELISSA MILLER | 5/1/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs MELISSA MILLER | |||||||||
18CVF00028 | MICHAEL SPICER | 5/1/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs MICHAEL SPICER | |||||||||
18CVF00027 | STEVEN TRUE | 5/1/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs STEVEN TRUE | |||||||||
18CVF00010 | AMANDA L SCHULTZ | 5/1/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs AMANDA L SCHULTZ | |||||||||
17CVF01986 | JOSEPH M ECKERT AKA JOSEPH M. ECKERT JR. | 5/1/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs JOSEPH M ECKERT ... | |||||||||
17CVF01950 | HEATHER C DAVIS | 5/1/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs HEATHER C DAVIS | |||||||||
17CVF01813 | DARRYL S. SANDERSON | 5/1/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs DARRYL S. SANDER... | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 449, 450, 451 ... 573, 574, 575 Next |