11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF00018 | SARAH G HALL | 4/17/2018 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs SARAH G HALL | |||||||||
18CVF00050 | CAROLINE WOODYEAR | 4/17/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs CAROLINE WOODYE... | |||||||||
18CVF00137 | JORDAN MCCLAIN | 4/17/2018 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JORDAN MCCLAIN | |||||||||
18CVF00164 | RICHARD R. BARNHART | 4/17/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs RICHARD R. BARN... | |||||||||
18CVF00199 | KELLY FRENCH | 4/17/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING vs KELLY FRENCH | |||||||||
18CVF00017 | TOMMY VO | 4/17/2018 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TOMMY VO | |||||||||
18CVF00296 | JOSEPH ECKERT | 4/13/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs JOSEPH ECKERT | |||||||||
18CVF00396 | KIMBERLY J. PHILLIPS | 4/13/2018 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs KIMBERLY J. PHILLIPS | |||||||||
17CVI00897 | RYAN RAYBURG | 4/12/2018 | |||||||
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, INC. C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs RYAN RAYBURG | |||||||||
17CVF01963 | ELIZABETH C SCHROEDER | 4/12/2018 | |||||||
APRIL ENTERPRISES INC. vs ELIZABETH C SCHROEDER | |||||||||
17CVF01576 | DALE E BENNETT | 4/12/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs DALE E BENNETT | |||||||||
17CVE00354 | JEREMY DESCHLER | 4/11/2018 | |||||||
ERIC SMITH vs JEREMY DESCHLER | |||||||||
18CVE00096 | NICHOLAS REYES | 4/10/2018 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY vs NICHOLAS REYES | |||||||||
17CVF00700 | JULIAN EGONA | 4/10/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs JULIAN EGONA | |||||||||
17CVF01052 | MICHAEL LANDIS | 4/10/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MICHAEL LANDIS | |||||||||
17CVF01530 | INDIA CLACK AKA INDIA C ROBINSON | 4/10/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs INDIA CLACK AKA INDIA C ROBINSON | |||||||||
17CVF01544 | ROBERT MCGHEE | 4/10/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ROBERT MCGHEE | |||||||||
17CVF01658 | STEPHANIE PLANCK AKA STEPHANIE LARKINS | 4/10/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs STEPHANIE PLANCK AKA STEPHANIE LARKINS | |||||||||
17CVF02038 | ALEXIS HAMBLIN | 4/10/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs ALEXIS HAMBLIN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 444, 445, 446 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |