11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF01422 | TONDIA K. DOSSETT | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TONDIA K. DOSSETT | |||||||||
17CVF01528 | MICHAEL PEITZ | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs MICHAEL PEITZ | |||||||||
17CVF01772 | PAUL HOLP | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs PAUL HOLP | |||||||||
17CVF01959 | DARBIE HUNT | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
TED THOMPSON vs DARBIE HUNT | |||||||||
17CVF01960 | DAVID MCCLASKEY | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
APRIL ENTERPRISES INC. vs DAVID MCCLASKEY | |||||||||
18CVF00013 | BENJAMIN J AMBURGEY | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A. vs BENJAMIN J AMBURGEY | |||||||||
18CVF00076 | ROBBIE HATTON | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs ROBBIE HATTON | |||||||||
18CVF00280 | ANGELA DUNIGAN | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs ANGELA DUNIGAN | |||||||||
18CVF00366 | CHRISTINA MOORE | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING vs CHRISTINA MOORE | |||||||||
18CVE00328 | ERIC L. AISPURO | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INS. CO. C/O ZEEHANDELAR, SABATINO & ASSO vs ERIC L. AISPURO | |||||||||
17CVF02008 | GWENDOLYN D. MCCLURE | 5/4/2018 | |||||||
APRIL ENTERPRISES INC. vs GWENDOLYN D. MCCLURE | |||||||||
18CVF00180 | STEVE WALLS JR. | 5/4/2018 | |||||||
CALVARY SPV I, LLC vs STEVE WALLS JR. | |||||||||
18CVI00369 | JEANNA PINSON | 5/3/2018 | |||||||
AA CRAVEN BAIL BONDS vs JEANNA PINSON | |||||||||
17CVF01955 | MICHAEL VANDERHORST | 5/2/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs MICHAEL VANDERHORST | |||||||||
18CVF00053 | ERIKA DILLON | 5/2/2018 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION vs ERIKA DILLON | |||||||||
17CVG02037 | HEATHER VOGEL | 5/2/2018 | |||||||
TERI BARNES vs HEATHER VOGEL | |||||||||
18CVI00459 | JAMES L. GRIFFIN | 5/2/2018 | |||||||
ROBERTA CRANK vs JAMES L. GRIFFIN | |||||||||
17CVF01711 | SHELLY SHIVELY | 5/1/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs SHELLY SHIVELY | |||||||||
17CVF01813 | DARRYL S. SANDERSON | 5/1/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs DARRYL S. SANDER... | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 441, 442, 443 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |