11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF01956 | MARY BANKS | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs MARY BANKS | |||||||||
18CVI00823 | FIFTH THIRD BANK C/O KC BAKER | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
DAN MORIKAWA vs FIFTH THIRD BANK C/O KC BAKER | |||||||||
18CVG00289 | MELISSA CABBERRA | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
LORI PRICE vs MELISSA CABBERRA | |||||||||
18CVG00288 | MELINDA CABBERRA | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
LORI PRICE vs MELINDA CABBERRA | |||||||||
18CVF00833 | KENDALL L. BASS | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs KENDALL L. BASS | |||||||||
18CVF00557 | NATALIE S. HARRIS | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQY, LLC vs NATALIE S. HARRIS | |||||||||
18CVF00472 | JAMES R. MACIK | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs JAMES R. MACIK | |||||||||
18CVF00385 | MICHAEL VANDERVEEN SR | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs MICHAEL VANDERVEEN SR | |||||||||
18CVF00032 | MARY L FROST-SCOTT | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A. vs MARY L FROST-SCOTT | |||||||||
17CVF02034 | DANIEL G. BELL | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs DANIEL G. BELL | |||||||||
17CVF01828 | GARY R ROLAND | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
MERRICK BANK CORPORATION vs GARY R ROLAND | |||||||||
18CVF00724 | ERICA KING AKA ERICA M WORRELL | 7/9/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ERICA KING AKA ERICA M WORRELL | |||||||||
18CVF00234 | KEITH BURNETT | 6/29/2018 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC. vs KEITH BURNETT | |||||||||
18CVF00254 | COTY CLEGHORN | 6/27/2018 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs COTY CLEGHORN | |||||||||
17CVF01038 | BEVERLY HUEY AKA BEVERLY J. HUEY | 6/26/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs BEVERLY HUEY AKA BEVERLY J. H... | |||||||||
17CVF01113 | BILLY MCCLURE AKA BILLY C. MCCLURE | 6/26/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs BILLY MCCLURE AKA BILLY C. MC... | |||||||||
17CVF01143 | CALVIN RUBY AKA CALVIN C. RUBY | 6/26/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs CALVIN RUBY AKA CALVIN C. RUB... | |||||||||
17CVF01237 | NORMA HARRISON | 6/26/2018 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs NORMA HARRISON | |||||||||
17CVF01933 | AMBER J HAYNES | 6/26/2018 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET CORP SERVICES INC. vs AMBER J HAYNES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 433, 434, 435 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |