11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF01364 | JUSTIN SHELLS | 9/20/2018 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JUSTIN SHELLS | |||||||||
18CVF00394 | MICHAEL JENKINS | 9/19/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs MICHAEL JENKINS | |||||||||
18CVF00796 | JENNIFER L. BANKSTON | 9/19/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs JENNIFER L. BAN... | |||||||||
18CVF01168 | ANNABELLE CLICK | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS INC. vs ANNABELLE CLICK | |||||||||
18CVF01417 | ARGENTINA MADISON | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS PC vs ARGENTINA MADISON | |||||||||
18CVF01350 | D WAYNE AKA WAYNE DEMPSEY II II | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs D WAYNE AKA WAYNE DEMP... | |||||||||
18CVF01124 | DAVID R. ADAE | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
SUN HOMES INC. C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO. LPA vs DAVID R. ADAE | |||||||||
18CVF01079 | MELISSA DOTSON AKA MELISSA S DOTSON | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING vs MELISSA DOTSON AKA MELISSA S D... | |||||||||
18CVF00603 | BETTY CLARK | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs BETTY CLARK | |||||||||
18CVF00497 | MICHAEL WARMOUTH | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs MICHAEL WARMOUTH | |||||||||
18CVF00390 | KENNETH BROCK | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs KENNETH BROCK | |||||||||
18CVF00295 | STEPHANIE PLANCK | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs STEPHANIE PLANCK | |||||||||
17CVF02003 | JANINE WOLF | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS vs JANINE WOLF | |||||||||
18CVF01199 | MARSHA HALE | 9/13/2018 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs MARSHA HALE | |||||||||
18CVF01106 | BRIAN STOVER | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL INC. TRUST 2015-1 vs BRIAN STOVER | |||||||||
18CVI01158 | ELISSA R. LAMB | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
GERALD E. GUNNOE DBA vs ELISSA R. LAMB | |||||||||
18CVE00702 | MONIQUE E. THIBODEAU | 9/11/2018 | |||||||
SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA vs MONIQUE E. THIBODEAU | |||||||||
17CVF01882 | DANIEL BARNETT | 9/11/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DANIEL BARNETT | |||||||||
17CVF02024 | TIP COLLINS | 9/11/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs TIP COLLINS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 420, 421, 422 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |