11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF01414 | SAM SALYERS | 10/2/2018 | |||||||
APRIL ENTERPRISES INC. vs SAM SALYERS | |||||||||
18CVF01287 | LILLY TRACY AKA LILLY RICE | 9/27/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC vs LILLY TRACY AKA LILLY RICE | |||||||||
18CVF01436 | ASHLEY M KERNS | 9/26/2018 | |||||||
JHPDE FINANCE I, LLC vs ASHLEY M KERNS | |||||||||
18CVI00720 | MATTHEW J. NEUHAUSEL | 9/26/2018 | |||||||
MARIE M. FEXIL vs MATTHEW J. NEUHAUSEL | |||||||||
18CVI01330 | TONYA HARRIS | 9/26/2018 | |||||||
JEFFREY S. CHANEY vs TONYA HARRIS | |||||||||
18CVF00837 | MORGAN NEAL | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC. vs MORGAN NEAL | |||||||||
17CVF02056 | PAMELA S KIDWELL | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQY, LLC vs PAMELA S KIDWELL | |||||||||
18CVF01196 | TONYA TINCH | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs TONYA TINCH | |||||||||
18CVF01187 | AMBER J. HAYNES | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs AMBER J. HAYNES | |||||||||
18CVF01019 | HALLIE TAYLOR | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs HALLIE TAYLOR | |||||||||
18CVF00959 | JASMINE WESTER | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS PC vs JASMINE WESTER | |||||||||
18CVF00916 | JIMELIA S. HARRISON | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs JIMELIA S. HARRISON | |||||||||
18CVF00879 | SOMMER CULLERS | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs SOMMER CULLERS | |||||||||
18CVF00835 | CRISTAL L. REED | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs CRISTAL L. REED | |||||||||
18CVF00721 | CHRISTOPHER A. JONES | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs CHRISTOPHER A. JONES | |||||||||
18CVF00480 | PATRICIA A. HODGSON | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs PATRICIA A. HODGSON | |||||||||
18CVF00363 | AMANDA STEWART | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs AMANDA STEWART | |||||||||
18CVF00045 | MANDE M. HARRIS | 9/25/2018 | |||||||
DAYTON GASTRONENTEROLOGY, INC. vs MANDE M. HARRIS | |||||||||
18CVF01178 | DIANNA BLEVINS | 9/21/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs DIANNA BLEVINS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 419, 420, 421 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |