11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
08CVH01214 | ROBERT GRIMES | 11/1/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC-(MFL) vs ROBERT GRIMES | |||||||||
18CVF00368 | CHERYL A. UNDERWOOD | 10/30/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs CHERYL A. UNDERWOOD | |||||||||
18CVF00776 | JENNIFER SELHORST | 10/30/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs JENNIFER SELHORST | |||||||||
18CVF01108 | MICHELLE GRAY | 10/30/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs MICHELLE GRAY | |||||||||
18CVF01153 | WILLIAM SNYDER | 10/30/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs WILLIAM SNYDER | |||||||||
18CVF01294 | GARY E THOMPSON | 10/30/2018 | |||||||
DAYTON GASTRONTEROLOGY, INC. vs GARY E THOMPSON | |||||||||
18CVF01437 | RENEE K. BLOSSOM | 10/30/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs RENEE K. BLOSSOM | |||||||||
18CVF00560 | AMBER NICHOLE LOVINS | 10/29/2018 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION INC. vs AMBER NICHOLE LOVINS | |||||||||
18CVF00993 | LESLIE R. JONES | 10/29/2018 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs LESLIE R. JONES | |||||||||
18CVF01494 | ELIZABETH ELLIS | 10/25/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs ELIZABETH ELLIS | |||||||||
18CVI00735 | UNIFIED PERFORMANCE | 10/25/2018 | |||||||
BRIXEY & MEYER INC. vs UNIFIED PERFORMANCE | |||||||||
18CVF00824 | TRACIE CANDELA | 10/25/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs TRACIE CANDELA | |||||||||
17CVF02015 | SUSAN S BOSTWICK | 10/24/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs SUSAN S BOSTWICK | |||||||||
18CVF01384 | DANIEL FLORKEY | 10/24/2018 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs DANIEL FLORKEY | |||||||||
18CVF01386 | DAVID MAYHEW | 10/24/2018 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs DAVID MAYHEW | |||||||||
18CVF01416 | MICHAEL K KONZ | 10/24/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS PC vs MICHAEL K KONZ | |||||||||
18CVE00406 | HARRY WILLIAM SHIELDS | 10/23/2018 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY vs HARRY WILLIAM SHIELDS | |||||||||
17CVF01818 | JAYSON JONES | 10/23/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs JAYSON JONES | |||||||||
18CVF00099 | CHAZ MARTIN | 10/23/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING vs CHAZ MARTIN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 416, 417, 418 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |