11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF01650 | JONI L. ELY | 11/15/2018 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JONI L. ELY | |||||||||
17CVF02018 | ANGELIA JACKSON | 11/13/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs ANGELIA JACKSON | |||||||||
18CVF00853 | ZACHARY BELL | 11/13/2018 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORP. C/O RACHEL J. MASON vs ZACHARY BELL | |||||||||
18CVF01105 | HEATHER KINDOLL AKA HEATHER N. ERNST | 11/13/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs HEATHER KINDOLL AKA HEATHER N. ERNST | |||||||||
18CVF01188 | MICHAEL CASEY | 11/13/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MICHAEL CASEY | |||||||||
18CVF01290 | KYLIE COHN | 11/13/2018 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET CORP SERVICES INC. vs KYLIE COHN | |||||||||
18CVF00958 | CHRISTOPHER M. MCCULLOUGH | 11/12/2018 | |||||||
JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQY, LLC vs CHRISTOPHER M. MCCULLOUGH | |||||||||
18CVF01234 | BARBARA SMITH | 11/9/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs BARBARA SMITH | |||||||||
18CVI01449 | JACQULIN M. CLEERE | 11/8/2018 | |||||||
PATTI BALLACHINO vs JACQULIN M. CLEERE | |||||||||
18CVI01572 | DONALD ADAMS | 11/8/2018 | |||||||
APRIL LAW vs DONALD ADAMS | |||||||||
17CVG00472 | CHAD EVERETTS, ET. AL | 11/8/2018 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LL DBA CARROLLTON POINTE APARTMENTS vs CHAD EVERETTS, ... | |||||||||
18CVF00968 | MORIAH FOSTER-DANSBY | 11/8/2018 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs MORIAH FOSTER-DANSBY | |||||||||
18CVF00160 | MARK E. OILER II | 11/7/2018 | |||||||
BRINKLEY PROPERTIES, LTD. vs MARK E. OILER II | |||||||||
18CVF00370 | JOLANDA E. MILLER | 11/6/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A. vs JOLANDA E. MILLER | |||||||||
18CVF00870 | DONNIE E. LAMB | 11/6/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs DONNIE E. LAMB | |||||||||
18CVF00935 | ROBIN M. COFFEY | 11/6/2018 | |||||||
CREDITMAX, INC. vs ROBIN M. COFFEY | |||||||||
18CVF01167 | ANGELA R. KNUTSON | 11/6/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs ANGELA R. KNUTSON | |||||||||
18CVF01324 | JERRY L WELLS | 11/6/2018 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JERRY L WELLS | |||||||||
18CVF01480 | MARK A. VARNADOE | 11/6/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. SBM TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO vs MARK A. VARNADOE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 415, 416, 417 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |