11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF01687 | CYNTHIA DUNAWAY | 11/27/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS PC vs CYNTHIA DUNAWAY | |||||||||
18CVF01062 | REBECCA L. WALLS | 11/21/2018 | |||||||
SECURITY NATIONAL BANK, DIVISION OF THE PARK NATIONAL BANK vs REBECCA L. WALLS | |||||||||
18CVF01421 | JAMES R MACIK | 11/20/2018 | |||||||
CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA vs JAMES R MACIK | |||||||||
18CVF01438 | STEVEN WARREN | 11/20/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING vs STEVEN WARREN | |||||||||
18CVF01191 | CARL L. LEET | 11/20/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs CARL L. LEET | |||||||||
18CVF01102 | DIANNA BLEVINS AKA DIANNA H PURVIS | 11/20/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DIANNA BLEVINS AKA DIANNA H PURVIS | |||||||||
18CVF01060 | STEVEN S. BARRETT | 11/20/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs STEVEN S. BARRETT | |||||||||
18CVF00938 | MICHAEL LYKINS | 11/20/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs MICHAEL LYKINS | |||||||||
18CVF00855 | ANTHONY GILES | 11/20/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs ANTHONY GILES | |||||||||
18CVF00841 | MICHAEL S. MURPHY | 11/20/2018 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs MICHAEL S. MURPHY | |||||||||
18CVF00775 | ANTHONY GILES | 11/20/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs ANTHONY GILES | |||||||||
17CVF01894 | MARK T BATES | 11/20/2018 | |||||||
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION C/O ZWICKER & ASSO. PC vs MARK T BATES | |||||||||
18CVF00275 | REGINALD BOLDS | 11/19/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs REGINALD BOLDS | |||||||||
18CVF00960 | DONALD WHITEMAN | 11/19/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs DONALD WHITEMAN | |||||||||
18CVF01129 | LESLIE JOHNSON | 11/19/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs LESLIE JOHNSON | |||||||||
18CVF01136 | NICOLE SHIDER | 11/19/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs NICOLE SHIDER | |||||||||
18CVF01366 | COURTNEY POWELL | 11/19/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs COURTNEY POWELL | |||||||||
18CVF01491 | VICKI LANE | 11/19/2018 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs VICKI LANE | |||||||||
17CVF01535 | SHEILA JACKSON | 11/15/2018 | |||||||
HEARTLAND OF MIAMISBURG OH, LLC DBA HEARTLAND OF MIAMISBURG vs SHEILA JACKSON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 414, 415, 416 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |