11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF00800 | JEFFREY D HACKNEY | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JEFFREY D HACKNEY | |||||||||
19CVF00839 | AMANDA STURGIS | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs AMANDA STURGIS | |||||||||
19CVF00848 | JOSHUA DAVIS AKA JOSHUA D. DAVIS | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. SBM ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO, I vs JOSHUA DAVIS AKA... | |||||||||
19CVF00885 | EMILY J. SCEARCE | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC. INC. vs EMILY J. SCEARCE | |||||||||
19CVF00778 | JONATHAN CRIHFIELD | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC vs JONATHAN CRIHFIELD | |||||||||
19CVF00440 | KIMBERLY S MILLER | 7/15/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs KIMBERLY S MILLER | |||||||||
19CVF00973 | LINDA D. ALEXANDER | 7/15/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs LINDA D. ALEXANDER | |||||||||
19CVF00336 | CARRIE L. CLARK | 7/11/2019 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs CARRIE L. CLARK | |||||||||
19CVF00494 | ASHLEE M. WIRT | 7/11/2019 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC. INC. vs ASHLEE M. WIRT | |||||||||
19CVF00666 | AMANDA MEDCALF | 7/11/2019 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs AMANDA MEDCALF | |||||||||
18CVF00947 | BETH HALL | 7/10/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. vs BETH HALL | |||||||||
19CVI00535 | AMANDA CHAMBERS | 7/10/2019 | |||||||
JARED LOVIN vs AMANDA CHAMBERS | |||||||||
19CVG01058 | DAVID PATRICK | 7/10/2019 | |||||||
SCOTT AND GARNETT LTD. vs DAVID PATRICK | |||||||||
19CVF01070 | BRIAN VICROY | 7/10/2019 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs BRIAN VICROY | |||||||||
19CVF00718 | BRENT EDWARD GERBIG | 7/10/2019 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs BRENT EDWARD GERBIG | |||||||||
19CVF00358 | ELLA SOUTHERLAND AKA ELLA E JONES | 7/10/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ELLA SOUTHERLAND AKA ELLA E JONES | |||||||||
18CVF01893 | TERRIE C. SMILEY | 7/10/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs TERRIE C. SMILEY | |||||||||
18CVF01286 | VIRGINIA SITES | 7/10/2019 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC vs VIRGINIA SITES | |||||||||
18CVF01498 | VICKIE HANNAH | 7/9/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs VICKIE HANNAH | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 382, 383, 384 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |