11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF00502 | ANTHONY JONES | 7/30/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs ANTHONY JONES | |||||||||
19CVF00551 | KIEFER THOMAS | 7/30/2019 | |||||||
JOSEPH W. WALKER vs KIEFER THOMAS | |||||||||
19CVF00668 | DANIEL GROSSMAN | 7/30/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs DANIEL GROSSMAN | |||||||||
19CVF00781 | GARY JOHNSON | 7/30/2019 | |||||||
PREMIER EMERGENCY CARE SERVICES, vs GARY JOHNSON | |||||||||
19CVF00878 | TRACEY B. OLEKAS | 7/30/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TRACEY B. OLEKAS | |||||||||
19CVG00368 | WILLIAM WALLACE | 7/30/2019 | |||||||
DEAN WRUCK vs WILLIAM WALLACE | |||||||||
19CVF00307 | ARGENTINA C. MADISON | 7/30/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. vs ARGENTINA C. MADISON | |||||||||
19CVF00050 | SANDRA S MCPHERSON | 7/29/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL INC. LLC AS SERVICER FOR ASF WILMINGTON T vs SANDRA S MCPHERSON | |||||||||
18CVF01897 | LOUIS DUDRICK | 7/25/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs LOUIS DUDRICK | |||||||||
19CVF00465 | SARAH RICH | 7/25/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DB IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs SARAH RICH | |||||||||
14CVG01266 | TONIA HEFLIN, ET AL. | 7/24/2019 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION vs TONIA HEFLIN, ET AL. | |||||||||
19CVI00969 | ZACHARY EISSA | 7/24/2019 | |||||||
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, INC. C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs ZACHARY EISSA | |||||||||
19CVI00961 | GERALD RICHARDSON | 7/24/2019 | |||||||
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, INC. C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs GERALD RICHARDSON | |||||||||
19CVI00960 | DAVID GALEHOUSE | 7/24/2019 | |||||||
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, INC. C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs DAVID GALEHOUSE | |||||||||
19CVE00503 | STEPHANIE NICOLE PAINTER | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COM vs STEPHANIE NICOLE PAINTER | |||||||||
18CVF01806 | RICHARD CHAVERS | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs RICHARD CHAVERS | |||||||||
18CVF02010 | JORGE ALDAZ | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JORGE ALDAZ | |||||||||
18CVF02017 | SUSAN OBERER | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs SUSAN OBERER | |||||||||
19CVF00085 | DAVID FREY | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs DAVID FREY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 380, 381, 382 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |