11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF00022 | ANITA JEFFERSON | 2/11/2020 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC ASSIGNEE OF LENDINGCLUB CORP vs ANITA JEFFERSON | |||||||||
19CVF02050 | CHRIS LYNCH | 2/11/2020 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs CHRIS LYNCH | |||||||||
19CVF02282 | SEAN SMIDDY | 2/7/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SEAN SMIDDY | |||||||||
19CVF00194 | THOMAS E HOWARD | 2/6/2020 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION INC. vs THOMAS E HOWARD | |||||||||
19CVF00715 | FRANCES GAINES | 2/6/2020 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC. vs FRANCES GAINES | |||||||||
19CVF00817 | LINDA LEWIS | 2/6/2020 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs LINDA LEWIS | |||||||||
19CVF01198 | ASHLEY STRATENBERGER | 2/6/2020 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs ASHLEY STRATENBERGER | |||||||||
19CVF01727 | ERIKA N. HARRIS | 2/6/2020 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION vs ERIKA N. HARRIS | |||||||||
19CVF01966 | HEATHER BLEVINS | 2/6/2020 | |||||||
REGIONAL ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs HEATHER BLEVINS | |||||||||
19CVI01903 | SPA EXPRESS LLC C/O JULIE NIGHSWANDER | 2/5/2020 | |||||||
TIFFANY HIGHLEY vs SPA EXPRESS LLC C/O JULIE NIGHSWANDER | |||||||||
19CVF01489 | LARRY WOOLDRIDGE | 2/4/2020 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs LARRY WOOLDRIDGE | |||||||||
19CVF02279 | JESSICA COE | 2/4/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs JESSICA COE | |||||||||
19CVF00501 | CORRIE M STORER | 1/31/2020 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs CORRIE M STORER | |||||||||
18CVF01983 | MADISON BEAR AKA MADISON BEAR | 1/30/2020 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs MADISON BEAR AKA MADISON BEAR | |||||||||
19CVF00425 | NANCY WILCHER | 1/30/2020 | |||||||
ROGERS & GREENBERG L.L.P. vs NANCY WILCHER | |||||||||
19CVF01251 | DANIELLE BURR AKA DANIELLE N. BURR | 1/30/2020 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs DANIELLE BURR AKA DANIELLE N. BURR | |||||||||
19CVF01841 | WILLIAM THOMAS | 1/30/2020 | |||||||
APRIL ENTERPRISES INC. vs WILLIAM THOMAS | |||||||||
19CVF02089 | AURELIO ORNOPIA AKA AURELIO L. ORNOPIA | 1/30/2020 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs AURELIO ORNOPIA AKA AURELIO L. ORNOPIA | |||||||||
19CVG01731 | ERIKA HATTON | 1/30/2020 | |||||||
PRINCELY BRUMEH vs ERIKA HATTON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 355, 356, 357 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |