11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF00179 | TIMOTHY HOWARD | 3/3/2020 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TIMOTHY HOWARD | |||||||||
19CVG00504 | DANNY SEXTON | 3/3/2020 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION vs DANNY SEXTON | |||||||||
19CVF02202 | BENJAMIN BERTRAND | 3/3/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs BENJAMIN BERTRAND | |||||||||
20CVF00071 | MARISA K. BOYER | 2/20/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs MARISA K. BOYER | |||||||||
19CVF01626 | OLIVIA BLANTON | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs OLIVIA BLANTON | |||||||||
19CVF01998 | QUINA LAWRENCE | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs QUINA LAWRENCE | |||||||||
19CVF01997 | VERONICA DAVIS | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs VERONICA DAVIS | |||||||||
19CVF01994 | GABY CIJULUS | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs GABY CIJULUS | |||||||||
19CVF01967 | KEVIN J. CRONENWETT | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVEST., LL ASSIGNEE OF 1ST NAT'L BANK OF OM vs KEVIN J. C... | |||||||||
19CVF01870 | CONNIE D. BOOMERSHINE | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CONNIE D. BOOMERSHINE | |||||||||
19CVF01738 | TAMMY BARROWCLIFF | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs TAMMY BARROWCLIFF | |||||||||
19CVF01550 | DOMINIQUE K. RAMSEY | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs DOMINIQUE K. RAMSEY | |||||||||
19CVF01541 | TRAVIS CAMPBELL | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs TRAVIS CAMPBELL | |||||||||
19CVF01516 | CYNTHIA DUNAWAY | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CYNTHIA DUNAWAY | |||||||||
19CVF01384 | MOLLIE SHOPE | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE, vs MOLLIE SHOPE | |||||||||
19CVF00635 | MELISSA S. DOTSON | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs MELISSA S. DOTSON | |||||||||
19CVF00430 | KARL G. HECKMANN | 2/19/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs KARL G. HECKMANN | |||||||||
19CVF01940 | TINA BIGGS AKA TINA MARIE HUFFMAN | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs TINA BIGGS AKA TINA MARIE HUFFMAN | |||||||||
19CVF02182 | KELLIE L. SLOAN | 2/13/2020 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC, INC. vs KELLIE L. SLOAN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 353, 354, 355 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |