11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF00606 | SHAWNA AYERS | 6/16/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs SHAWNA AYERS | |||||||||
19CVF02219 | JULIE YOUNG | 6/16/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC. vs JULIE YOUNG | |||||||||
20CVH00691 | DON PETIT REGISTAR | 6/15/2020 | |||||||
MATHEW LOWE vs DON PETIT REGISTAR | |||||||||
19CVF01701 | DANIEL L. BARNETT | 6/11/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs DANIEL L. BARNETT | |||||||||
20CVF00322 | SETH D. CORNELIUS | 6/10/2020 | |||||||
BALTES COMMERCIAL REALTY vs SETH D. CORNELIUS | |||||||||
20CVI00278 | KRISTINE N. LANDERS | 6/10/2020 | |||||||
BO JI ZHU vs KRISTINE N. LANDERS | |||||||||
20CVI00363 | RICHARD (RICK) UNDERWOOD | 6/10/2020 | |||||||
KENNETH TERPENNING vs RICHARD (RICK) UNDERWOOD | |||||||||
20CVI00466 | DOUG BALLARD | 6/10/2020 | |||||||
BARNES WILDLIFE CONTROL, LLC vs DOUG BALLARD | |||||||||
20CVF00070 | CAITLIN N. GENTRY | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs CAITLIN N. GENTRY | |||||||||
19CVF02203 | BRENDA L. TALLENT AKA BRENDA HATLEY | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs BRENDA L. TALLENT AKA BRENDA HATLEY | |||||||||
19CVF02161 | SCOTT TRIBBEY | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SCOTT TRIBBEY | |||||||||
19CVF02106 | CURTIS KOHLER | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A. vs CURTIS KOHLER | |||||||||
19CVF02007 | CERA HUMERICK AKA CERA A. HUMERICK | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CERA HUMERICK AKA CERA A. HUMERICK | |||||||||
19CVF01959 | ANGELA J. WARNER | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs ANGELA J. WARNER | |||||||||
19CVF01895 | SAKINAH H. ABDUL KARIM | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A. vs SAKINAH H. ABDUL KARIM | |||||||||
19CVF01671 | LINDA S. AUFULDISH | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs LINDA S. AUFULDISH | |||||||||
19CVF01617 | KAYLEY J. CROWE | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A. vs KAYLEY J. CROWE | |||||||||
19CVF01527 | CHARLENE KARACIA | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs CHARLENE KARACIA | |||||||||
19CVF01291 | RACHEL MARKER | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs RACHEL MARKER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 342, 343, 344 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |