11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF00402 | SAMANTHA C. YU BLYTHE | 7/8/2020 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC INC vs SAMANTHA C. YU BLYTHE | |||||||||
20CVE00250 | TEVIN G STEWART | 7/7/2020 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COM vs TEVIN G STEWART | |||||||||
19CVF02239 | NIJMEH J. SHTEIWI | 7/7/2020 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs NIJMEH J. SHTEIWI | |||||||||
20CVF00288 | KEVIN FLYNN | 7/7/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK vs KEVIN FLYNN | |||||||||
20CVF00642 | ASHLEY M. HOUSTON | 7/7/2020 | |||||||
FRIENDLY FINANCE CORPORATION C/O RACHEL MASON vs ASHLEY M. HOUSTON | |||||||||
19CVF01898 | MAUREEN PEGUERO | 7/1/2020 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs MAUREEN PEGUERO | |||||||||
19CVF01661 | AUDREY L. MINSER | 6/30/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING vs AUDREY L. MINSER | |||||||||
19CVF02167 | REBECCA VAUGHN | 6/30/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs REBECCA VAUGHN | |||||||||
20CVF00510 | SHARI L. BALL | 6/30/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs SHARI L. BALL | |||||||||
20CVF00285 | LINDSAYANNE SCHRACK | 6/29/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs LINDSAYANNE SCHRACK | |||||||||
20CVF00569 | TIMOTHY L. HOWARD | 6/25/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs TIMOTHY L. HOWARD | |||||||||
19CVF00141 | APRIL METCALF | 6/24/2020 | |||||||
JOEL JOHNSON vs APRIL METCALF | |||||||||
19CVF01996 | MOHAMED ABDI IBRAHIM | 6/24/2020 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs MOHAMED ABDI IBRAHIM | |||||||||
20CVG00125 | KAITLYN ALBERTSON | 6/24/2020 | |||||||
KIRBY STRAYER vs KAITLYN ALBERTSON | |||||||||
19CVF01865 | AMY FADER | 6/23/2020 | |||||||
WILSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL vs AMY FADER | |||||||||
20CVF00387 | TODD WOODS | 6/23/2020 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC. vs TODD WOODS | |||||||||
20CVF00580 | STEVEN M. HERNANDEZ | 6/23/2020 | |||||||
CVI SGP-CO ACQUISITION TRUST vs STEVEN M. HERNANDEZ | |||||||||
20CVG00099 | KARLI SIZEMORE, AND ALL OTHERS | 6/17/2020 | |||||||
PHILIP G MILLER vs KARLI SIZEMORE, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVI01537 | AMANDA L. JONES | 6/17/2020 | |||||||
KEITH KLINE vs AMANDA L. JONES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 341, 342, 343 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |