11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF01981 | BONNIE SUE CRAYCRAFT | 7/23/2020 | |||||||
KH NETWORK CREDIT UNION vs BONNIE SUE CRAYCRAFT | |||||||||
19CVF01159 | LOWELL PHELPS | 7/23/2020 | |||||||
OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY ASSIGNEE OF GUARANTY BANK vs LOWELL PHELPS | |||||||||
19CVF02000 | BENJAMIN WILSON | 7/22/2020 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs BENJAMIN WILSON | |||||||||
20CVF00409 | BRIAN DEMARKE | 7/22/2020 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP vs BRIAN DEMARKE | |||||||||
20CVI00653 | DAVID STRASSBURGER | 7/22/2020 | |||||||
AA CRAVEN BAIL BONDS vs DAVID STRASSBURGER | |||||||||
19CVF00241 | SHEMECA STILES-NICKERSON | 7/21/2020 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC. DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs SHEMECA STILES-NICKERSON | |||||||||
19CVF01333 | AMY ISON | 7/21/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE, vs AMY ISON | |||||||||
19CVF02126 | NIJMEH SHITEIWI | 7/21/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs NIJMEH SHITEIWI | |||||||||
20CVF00367 | DEVIN MCDONOUGH | 7/21/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs DEVIN MCDONOUGH | |||||||||
20CVF00591 | LAURA BAKER | 7/21/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE, vs LAURA BAKER | |||||||||
19CVF02183 | JOSHUA B. LUCAS | 7/17/2020 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC. INC. vs JOSHUA B. LUCAS | |||||||||
20CVF00215 | SHANTE INGRAM | 7/16/2020 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs SHANTE INGRAM | |||||||||
19CVF01125 | LINDA L. SANDERSON | 7/14/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs LINDA L. SANDERSON | |||||||||
20CVF00049 | JOSHUA T. GAUL | 7/14/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JOSHUA T. GAUL | |||||||||
20CVF00390 | MEGAN BROOKS | 7/14/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs MEGAN BROOKS | |||||||||
20CVF00515 | KIMBERLY S. MILLER | 7/14/2020 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs KIMBERLY S. MILLER | |||||||||
20CVF00536 | KALIB T. SHAFFER | 7/14/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs KALIB T. SHAFFER | |||||||||
20CVF00485 | ANNIE FASONE | 7/9/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs ANNIE FASONE | |||||||||
20CVF00488 | DENISE L. GUM | 7/9/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs DENISE L. GUM | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 340, 341, 342 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |