11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF00472 | CHELSEA M. ALLEN | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
CBCS vs CHELSEA M. ALLEN | |||||||||
20CVF00568 | JAMIE CAMMON | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
CBCS vs JAMIE CAMMON | |||||||||
20CVF00698 | ANTHONY HARRIS | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ANTHONY HARRIS | |||||||||
20CVF00769 | CHERYL CLOS | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CHERYL CLOS | |||||||||
20CVF01328 | ERIC N. LANGLOIS AKA ERIC NORMAL LANGLOIS | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
FORD MOTOR COMPANY vs ERIC N. LANGLOIS AKA ERIC NORMAL LANGLOIS | |||||||||
20CVG00183 | JAMIE BEAUDOIN, AND ALL OTHERS | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC. DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs JAMIE BEAUDOIN, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
20CVF00462 | KAREN THOMAS | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND LP. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC. vs KAREN THOMAS | |||||||||
20CVF00496 | TOMMY LEE STANSBERRY | 1/11/2021 | |||||||
FIRST PORTFOLIO VENTURES I, LLC vs TOMMY LEE STANSBERRY | |||||||||
20CVF00584 | EMILY N. CAMPBELL | 1/5/2021 | |||||||
CVI SGP-CO ACQUISITION TRUST vs EMILY N. CAMPBELL | |||||||||
20CVF01365 | EMILE C. THOMAS | 1/4/2021 | |||||||
CREDITMAX, INC. vs EMILE C. THOMAS | |||||||||
19CVF02083 | JOSEPH D. BARKER | 12/23/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JOSEPH D. BARKER | |||||||||
20CVI01353 | CHO'S SHOE REPAIR C/O HELEN SHIN | 12/23/2020 | |||||||
LISA CURRY vs CHO'S SHOE REPAIR c/o HELEN SHIN | |||||||||
20CVF01325 | BRENT CARTER AKA BRENT P. CARTER | 12/23/2020 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs BRENT CARTER AKA BRENT P. CARTER | |||||||||
19CVF01897 | JESSICA L. TAYLOR | 12/22/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS PC vs JESSICA L. TAYLOR | |||||||||
20CVF00087 | JEANIE HANSHELL | 12/22/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JEANIE HANSHELL | |||||||||
20CVF00481 | ANGELA M. SUMPTER | 12/22/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs ANGELA M. SUMPTER | |||||||||
20CVF00798 | STEVEN MEYER | 12/22/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs STEVEN MEYER | |||||||||
20CVF00577 | AULBREY M. FISHER | 12/2/2020 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs AULBREY M. FISHER | |||||||||
20CVF00751 | DARREN DAVIS | 12/2/2020 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION vs DARREN DAVIS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 325, 326, 327 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |