11497 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2400284 | GARBA, SUSAN L | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs GARBA, SUSAN L | |||||||||
CVF2400283 | MCGUIRE, FARRAH | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MCGUIRE, FARRAH | |||||||||
CVG2400510 | HOEHENBERGER, KAYLA S | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
BRIDHESTREAM PROPERTY MGMT vs HOEHENBERGER, KAYLA S | |||||||||
CVF2401599 | MURRELL, APRIL | 3/28/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs MURRELL, APRIL | |||||||||
CVF2400709 | MILLER, JENNIFER | 3/27/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs MILLER, JENNIFER | |||||||||
CVG2500506 | MUSEITIF, FATMA | 3/27/2025 | |||||||
CONIFERS REAL ESTATE LLC vs MUSEITIF, FATMA | |||||||||
CVF2401593 | WRIGHT, JAMES | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs WRIGHT, JAMES | |||||||||
CVG2500442 | BOURNE, EMILY | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
WALLICK PROPERTIES MIDWEST vs BOURNE, EMILY | |||||||||
CVG2500431 | WARE, JAMES | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
AH4R MANAGEMENT-OH, LLC vs WARE, JAMES | |||||||||
CVG2500483 | CARTER, JAYLA | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
FOCUS PM LLC vs CARTER, JAYLA | |||||||||
CVF2401633 | WILKERSON, CHASITY | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
BCG EQUITIES LLC vs WILKERSON, CHASITY | |||||||||
CVF2401740 | BLAKE, NORMAN L | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BLAKE, NORMAN L | |||||||||
CVF2401801 | HUNT, MARY | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs HUNT, MARY | |||||||||
CVG2500452 | WORKS, DONIKA | 3/25/2025 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs WORKS, DONIKA | |||||||||
CVF2500077 | PRESHER, BRYAN | 3/25/2025 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs PRESHER, BRYAN | |||||||||
CVF2500219 | BERNA, DEVIN A | 3/25/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE NA vs BERNA, DEVIN A | |||||||||
CVF2402348 | MARTIN, DONALD A | 3/25/2025 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, vs MARTIN, DONALD A | |||||||||
CVF2402205 | WITTMAN, RHONDA | 3/25/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs WITTMAN, RHONDA | |||||||||
CVG2500462 | CATTANI, TRESSA | 3/25/2025 | |||||||
WAINSCOTT, KYLE vs CATTANI, TRESSA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 17, 18, 19 ... 573, 574, 575 Next |