11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2500525 | JOHNSON, GARY | 4/1/2025 | |||||||
SUN HOMES SERVICES, INC vs JOHNSON, GARY | |||||||||
CVF2401543 | WRIGHT, TIMOTHY | 4/1/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, NA vs WRIGHT, TIMOTHY | |||||||||
CVF2401678 | GUINDI, MARK A | 4/1/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE N.A. vs GUINDI, MARK A | |||||||||
CVG2400509 | SLOCUM, AMBER | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
MONARCH INVESTMENT & MGMT vs SLOCUM, AMBER | |||||||||
CVG2400502 | ALKAYYAL, FAISAL | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES INC vs ALKAYYAL, FAISAL | |||||||||
CVF2400283 | MCGUIRE, FARRAH | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MCGUIRE, FARRAH | |||||||||
CVF2402164 | REED, JANETTA R | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs REED, JANETTA R | |||||||||
CVG2400510 | HOEHENBERGER, KAYLA S | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
BRIDHESTREAM PROPERTY MGMT vs HOEHENBERGER, KAYLA S | |||||||||
CVF2400284 | GARBA, SUSAN L | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs GARBA, SUSAN L | |||||||||
CVG2400506 | SPINKS, DYLAN | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
SAFFORD PROPERTY MGMT LTD vs SPINKS, DYLAN | |||||||||
CVF2401599 | MURRELL, APRIL | 3/28/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs MURRELL, APRIL | |||||||||
CVG2500506 | MUSEITIF, FATMA | 3/27/2025 | |||||||
CONIFERS REAL ESTATE LLC vs MUSEITIF, FATMA | |||||||||
CVF2400709 | MILLER, JENNIFER | 3/27/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs MILLER, JENNIFER | |||||||||
CVG2500431 | WARE, JAMES | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
AH4R MANAGEMENT-OH, LLC vs WARE, JAMES | |||||||||
CVF2401593 | WRIGHT, JAMES | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs WRIGHT, JAMES | |||||||||
CVG2500483 | CARTER, JAYLA | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
FOCUS PM LLC vs CARTER, JAYLA | |||||||||
CVF2401633 | WILKERSON, CHASITY | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
BCG EQUITIES LLC vs WILKERSON, CHASITY | |||||||||
CVF2401801 | HUNT, MARY | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs HUNT, MARY | |||||||||
CVG2500442 | BOURNE, EMILY | 3/26/2025 | |||||||
WALLICK PROPERTIES MIDWEST vs BOURNE, EMILY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 9, 10, 11 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |